Thomas v. Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc
Plaintiff: Elzbieta Thomas
Defendant: Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01786
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendant's motion for an extension of time #9 until 1/20/20 in which to file a response to the complaint is granted. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/10/20. (Constantine, A.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 20, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc. (Skubas, Sarah)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa M. Farmer on behalf of Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc (Farmer, Alexa)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc (Skubas, Sarah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc waiver sent on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/12/2020 filed by Elzbieta Thomas. (Sabatini, James) Modified on 12/13/2019 to correct service and answer dates (Reis, Julia).
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Elzbieta Thomas Signed by Clerk on 11/13/2019.(Peterson, M)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/12/2019. (Peterson, M)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/12/2019.(Peterson, M)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2020. Discovery due by 5/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2019. (Peterson, M)
November 12, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5538505.), filed by Elzbieta Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sabatini, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elzbieta Thomas
Represented By: James V. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elim Park Baptist Home, Inc
Represented By: Sarah R. Skubas
Represented By: Alexa M. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?