In re: G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC
Not Yet Classified: US Trustee
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Richard Coan, George Wolf, Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company and Ocwen Loan Servicing
Appellant: G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01798
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 Joint RESPONSE re #15 Objection, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -JOINTLY FILED WITH CATIC, #10 MOTION to Dismiss in Part the Appeal Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8013 filed by Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gugliotti, Thomas)
January 2, 2020 Filing 15 OBJECTION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -JOINTLY FILED WITH CATIC, #10 MOTION to Dismiss in Part the Appeal Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8013 filed by G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Beck, Kenneth) Modified on 1/3/2020 to amend docket text to reflect correct motions being opposed (Peterson, M).
December 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -JOINTLY FILED WITH CATIC. Responses due by 1/3/2020 (Johnson, D.)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 G.L.A.D. Enterprises' motion for an extension of time until 1/3/20 in which to respond to the motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 12/26/19. (Constantine, A.)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/03/2020 to file Objection to Appellees Motion to Dismiss by G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC. (Beck, Kenneth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for to Correct Response Deadline to ECF No. 10 Order by Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company. (Stiles, Matthew)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction -JOINTLY FILED WITH CATIC by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing.Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Report Case No. 19-50604, #2 Exhibit Schedules Doc. No. 19-50604, #3 Exhibit Adversary Complaint Case No. 19-05018, #4 Exhibit Memordum of Decision -Abstension and Dismissal, #5 Exhibit Notice of Appeal Id. No. 1 Case No. 19-05018, #6 Exhibit Statement of Issues for Appeal Doc. Id. No. 34 Case 19-50604)(Clark, Sean)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss in Part the Appeal Under Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8013 by Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company.Responses due by 1/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gugliotti, Thomas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel/parties regarding briefing Signed by Clerk on 12/9/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne B. Sutton on behalf of George Wolf (Sutton, Suzanne)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Stiles on behalf of Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company , Appellee (Stiles, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/13/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 11/13/2019. (Fanelle, N.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 19-50604, filed by G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum #30) (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Sean P. Clark
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Cannella
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Richard Coan
Represented By: Richard M. Coan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: George Wolf
Represented By: Suzanne B. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Connecticut Attorneys Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas A. Gugliotti
Represented By: Adam B. Marks
Represented By: Matthew Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ocwen Loan Servicing
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker
Represented By: Sean P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: G.L.A.D. Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Alan Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?