Norwich v. Southern New England Home Buyers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Norwich
Defendant: Southern New England Home Buyers, LLC and Dade Realty Company I, LLC
Petitioner: Sheri Speer
Case Number: 3:2019cv01823
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 RULING denying #14 Emergency MOTION to Reinstate Matter by Sheri Speer. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/13/2020. (Reis, Julia)
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 Emergency MOTION to Reinstate Matter by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 RULING granting #4 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/7/20. (Pesta, J.)
January 7, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pesta, J.)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO #9 Standing Order on Removed Cases by Sheri Speer filed by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO #4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court and 10 Order to Show Cause filed by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Movant, Sheri Speer, defendants Southern New England Home Buyers, LLC and Dade Realty Company I, LLC, are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by DECEMBER 2, 2019, why plaintiffs #4 Motion to Remand to State Court should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 12/2/2019. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/21/2019. (DeRubeis, B.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by City of Norwich, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Sheri Speer, #4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Norwich, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by City of Norwich Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Norwich.Responses due by 12/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wickless, Aimee)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee L. Wickless on behalf of City of Norwich Corrected Appearance (Wickless, Aimee)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee L. Wickless on behalf of City of Norwich (Wickless, Aimee)
November 18, 2019 Filing fee received from Sheri Speer: $ 400, receipt number 153426 (Peterson, M)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocol Attachment) (Peterson, M)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/15/2019. (Peterson, M)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/15/2019. (Peterson, M)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2020. Discovery due by 5/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/20/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2019. (Peterson, M)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sheri Speer from Judicial District of Norwich/New London, case number KNL-CV19-6040218-S, filed by Sheri Speer. (Peterson, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwich v. Southern New England Home Buyers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern New England Home Buyers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dade Realty Company I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Norwich
Represented By: Aimee L. Wickless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sheri Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?