Johnson v. Allergan USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Johnson
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01845
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of Connecticut Superior Court. (Pipech, L.)
December 18, 2019 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Pipech, L.)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/13/2019. (Gazzola, Mario)
December 10, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lisa Johnson.Responses due by 12/31/2019 (Steigman, Todd)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER:Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/2/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 22, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Allergan USA, Inc. to 12/25/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 12/25/2019 to file a responsive pleading or motion directed to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/22/2019. (Rickevicius, L.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 25, 2019 to file a responsive pleading or motion directed to Plaintiff's complaint by Allergan USA, Inc.. (Mastrony, Maura)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice (Other) filed by Allergan USA, Inc., #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Allergan USA, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Allergan USA, Inc., #10 Notice, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allergan USA, Inc., #9 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Allergan USA, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Allergan USA, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/18/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 11/18/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. Discovery due by 5/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/18/2019.(Murphy, Tatihana)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allergan USA, Inc.. (Mastrony, Maura)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Allergan USA, Inc. Statement Regarding Removed Cases (Mastrony, Maura)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Allergan USA, Inc. of Pending Motions (Mastrony, Maura)
November 18, 2019 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Anastasio, F.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Thomas Dickinson on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc. (Dickinson, Craig)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Mastrony on behalf of Allergan USA, Inc. (Mastrony, Maura)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allergan USA, Inc. from Superior Court, case number MMX-CV19-6026586. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5549456, filed by Allergan USA, Inc..(Mastrony, Maura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Thomas Dickinson
Represented By: Maura Mastrony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Todd D. Steigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?