Collins v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: David W. Collins
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01848
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint, on consent, to 1/19/20. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 12/19/19. (Tooker, A.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Goodfellow, James)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 19, 2020 for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Responsively Plead to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Dykas, Melanie)
November 21, 2019 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Defendant Prudential Insurance's #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant will answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by December 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/21/19. (Gutierrez, A.)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 19, 2019Unopposed Expedited Motion for An Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodfellow, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Goodfellow, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Goodfellow, Jr on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America (Goodfellow, James)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dykas on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Dykas, Melanie)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, Aetna Life Insurance Company, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, #9 Standing Protective Order, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, Aetna Life Insurance Company, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company Signed by Clerk on 11/20/19. (Barry, Donna)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/19/19. (Barry, Donna)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 11/19/19. (Barry, Donna)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2020, Discovery due by 5/20/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 6/24/2020 Signed by Clerk on 11/19/19. (Barry, Donna)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Prudential Insurance Company of America re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Adverse Parties of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tucci, Theodore)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy Inc for Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Tucci, Theodore)
November 19, 2019 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Aetna Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of No Pending Motions (Tucci, Theodore)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Prudential Insurance Company of America re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendants' Removal Standing Order Statement (Tucci, Theodore)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Tucci on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Tucci, Theodore)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Insurance Company from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number CV-19-6091036-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5550976, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tucci, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Collins
Represented By: Allan M. Cane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Melanie Dykas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James C. Goodfellow, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?