DiAmore v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Joan DiAmore
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs and USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01882
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 First NOTICE by Joan DiAmore re #7 Electronic Summons Issued, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Council, Shawn)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 First SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joan DiAmore. All Defendants. (Council, Shawn)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *USA, United States Department of Veterans Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Shawn Council* *Shawn Council, LLC* *360 Bloomfield Avenue, Ste. 301* *Windsor, CT 06095*. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 27, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Council, Shawn)
November 27, 2019 ENTERED IN ERROR - Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Joan DiAmore. (Council, Shawn) Modified docket text on 11/27/2019 (Agati, Kathryn).
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Veterans Affairs* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Shawn L. Council* *743-745 Blue Hills Ave.* *Bloomfield, CT 06002*. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Joan DiAmore, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 11/26/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/25/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/25/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/24/2020, Discovery due by 5/26/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2019. (Agati, Kathryn)
November 25, 2019 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Oliver, T.)
November 25, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Council, Shawn)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5561850.), filed by Joan DiAmore.(Council, Shawn) Modified on 11/26/2019 to correct filed against party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiAmore v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan DiAmore
Represented By: Shawn L. Council
Represented By: Shawn Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?