Klinger v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Billie Joe Klinger
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01909
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Elizabeth Tomasco on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Tomasco, Jean)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 12/19/2019, answer due 2/17/2020 filed by Billie Joe Klinger. (Ellis, Hudson)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Tucci on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Tucci, Theodore)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Freberg, B)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Billie Joe Klinger Signed by Clerk on 12/5/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/4/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/4/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2020; Discovery due by 6/4/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/4/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 4, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Walker, J.)
December 4, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Ellis, Hudson)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5573869.), filed by Billie Joe Klinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Civil Cover Sheet)(Ellis, Hudson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klinger v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Theodore J. Tucci
Represented By: Jean Elizabeth Tomasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Joe Klinger
Represented By: Hudson Taylor Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?