Robinson v. 7C Diamonds, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sarah Robinson
Defendant: 7C Diamonds, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01925
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7C Diamonds, Inc.. (Gardner, Kristi)
January 13, 2020 Answer deadline updated for 7C Diamonds, Inc. to 2/22/2020. (Freberg, B)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/13/2020. (Freberg, B)
January 10, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/24/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 22, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 7C Diamonds, Inc.. (Gardner, Kristi)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Marie Gardner on behalf of 7C Diamonds, Inc. (Gardner, Kristi)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly Knapp Anderson on behalf of 7C Diamonds, Inc. (Knapp Anderson, Beverly)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Robinson. 7C Diamonds, Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020. (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *7C Diamonds, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Emanuele Robert Cicchiello* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Freberg, B)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sarah Robinson, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah Robinson. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2020; Discovery due by 6/6/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 6, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Sarah Robinson (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
December 6, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 7C Diamonds, Inc.. (Michaud, Megan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 7C Diamonds, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5579933.), filed by Sarah Robinson.(Michaud, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. 7C Diamonds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Robinson
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7C Diamonds, Inc.
Represented By: Kristi Marie Gardner
Represented By: Beverly Knapp Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?