Federici Brands LLC v. Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited
Plaintiff: Federici Brands LLC
Defendant: Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited
Case Number: 3:2019cv01928
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared Robinson Smith on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Smith, Jared)
January 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Ira P Rothken on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Rothken, Ira)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #27 Motion for Attorney Jared R. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2020. (Velez, F.) Modified on 1/17/2020 to correct event to indicate granting (Velez, F.).
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro hac vice as to Ira P. Rothken. Signed by Clerk on 01/15/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana)
January 13, 2020 Answer deadline updated to 3/2/2020 per Dkt. 29. (Shafer, J.)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading and conduct Rule 26(f) planning conference until 03/02/2020. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause as required by Local Rule 7, which requires counsel to show why, in the exercise of due diligence, counsel was not able to meet the presumptively reasonable deadline established by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/13/2020. (Nault, James)
January 13, 2020 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 2, 2020, NUNC PRO TUNC, to Plead by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Slossberg, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jared R. Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5627409) by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Slossberg, David)
January 8, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ira P. Rothken to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5627396) by Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Slossberg, David)
January 2, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Ann Sharp on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Sharp, Sara)
January 2, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Slossberg on behalf of Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited (Slossberg, David)
January 2, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Michael Nuzzaci on behalf of Federici Brands LLC (Nuzzaci, Daniel)
January 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by David Donahue on behalf of Federici Brands LLC (Donahue, David)
January 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Margiotta on behalf of Federici Brands LLC (Margiotta, John)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear pro hac vice as to John Margiotta. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Donahue. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro hac vice as to Daniel Nuzzaci. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/2019. (Murphy, Tatihana)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federici Brands LLC. Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) John Margiotta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Federici Brands LLC. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) David Donahue to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Federici Brands LLC. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel Nuzzaci to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Federici Brands LLC. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #10 , #11 , and #12 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to re-filing. Local Rule 83.1(d) requires each motion to be accompanied by a sworn affidavit that "identif[ies] the bar of each court of which said attorney is and has ever been a member, and the corresponding bar identification number(s); or if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating." D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.1(d)(1)(b). The Court interprets this requirement literally and cannot grant pro hac vice admission without each bar number, or if there is none, so stating. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/18/2019. (Nault, James)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) John Margiotta to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586572) by Federici Brands LLC. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) David Donahue to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586559) by Federici Brands LLC. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel Nuzzaci to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5586548) by Federici Brands LLC. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tony Miodonka* *Finn Dixon & Herling LLP* *6 Landmark Square, Suite 600* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Shafer, J.)
December 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Shafer, J.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, and #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2020; Discovery due by 6/6/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 7/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Shafer, J.)
December 6, 2019 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federici Brands LLC. (Miodonka, Tony)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5580025.), filed by Federici Brands LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miodonka, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federici Brands LLC v. Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fit & Glow Healthcare Private Limited
Represented By: Jared Robinson Smith
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Represented By: Ira P Rothken
Represented By: Sara Ann Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federici Brands LLC
Represented By: Tony Miodonka
Represented By: John P Margiotta
Represented By: Daniel Michael Nuzzaci
Represented By: David Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?