Stapleton v. Wheeler Clinic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Stapleton
Defendant: Wheeler Clinic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01944
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2612
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Park, Caroline)
January 30, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Wheeler Clinic, Inc..(Gambardella, Mary)
January 13, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Wheeler Clinic, Inc. to 1/30/2020. (Smith, E)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 30, 2020 To File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/13/2020. (Smith, E)
January 8, 2020 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 30, 2020 To File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint by Wheeler Clinic, Inc.. (Park, Caroline)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Mary Stapleton (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mary Stapleton. (Reilly, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Wheeler Clinic, Inc. to 1/16/2020. (Smith, E)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 16, 2020 To Plead in Response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/12/2019. (Smith, E)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 16, 2020 To Plead in Response to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff by Wheeler Clinic, Inc.. (Park, Caroline)
December 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #10 Standing Protective Order, #4 Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by Wheeler Clinic, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Mary A. Gambardella on behalf of Wheeler Clinic, Inc., #7 Certificate of Service filed by Wheeler Clinic, Inc., #1 Notice of Removal filed by Wheeler Clinic, Inc., #9 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Caroline B Park on behalf of Wheeler Clinic, Inc., #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wheeler Clinic, Inc., #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Wheeler Clinic, Inc., #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 12/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/8/2020. Discovery due by 6/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 10, 2019 Judge Stefan R Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wheeler Clinic, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Gambardella, Mary)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline B Park on behalf of Wheeler Clinic, Inc. (Park, Caroline)
December 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wheeler Clinic, Inc. of Pending Motions (Gambardella, Mary)
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wheeler Clinic, Inc. Statement Pursuant to Standing Order on Removed Cases (Gambardella, Mary)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wheeler Clinic, Inc.. (Gambardella, Mary)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary A. Gambardella on behalf of Wheeler Clinic, Inc. (Gambardella, Mary)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wheeler Clinic, Inc. from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV-19-6120405. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5584577, filed by Wheeler Clinic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gambardella, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stapleton v. Wheeler Clinic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler Clinic, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline B Park
Represented By: Mary A. Gambardella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Stapleton
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?