Cruz Martinez v. Charles et al
Petitioner: Emmanuel Cruz Martinez
Respondent: Chad Wolf, Thomas Homan, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, William P. Barr, Marcos Charles and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01946
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Habeas Petition by William P. Barr, Marcos Charles, Thomas Homan, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf.Responses due by 2/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibt A Attachment 1, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit B Attachment 1, #6 Exhibit B Attachment 2, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit C Attachment 1, #9 Exhibit C Attachment 2, #10 Exhibit C Attachment 3, #11 Exhibit C Attachment 4, #12 Exhibit C Attachment 5, #13 Exhibit C Attachment 6)(McConaghy, Michelle)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/12/2019. For reasons stated on the record, and absent objection from the Government, the court orders a temporary stay of the removal of Mr. Cruz Martinez through April 17, 2020. The Government shall file its Response to Cruz Martinez's Petition by January 31, 2020. Cruz Martinez shall file his reply by February 28, 2020. If the Government intends to file a Sur-Reply, it shall do so by March 10, 2020. Total time: 60 minutes. (Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (DeRubeis, B.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/12/2019 03:00 PM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Assistant U.S. Attorney Michelle McConaghy will represent the government defendants for this call. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. This conference call is to be arranged between counsel. Once all parties are on the line, please telephone chambers at (203) 773-2428. (DeRubeis, B.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Emmanuel Cruz Martinez.Responses due by 1/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Bhandary-Alexander, James)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/11/2019. (Reis, Julia)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/11/2019. (Reis, Julia)
December 11, 2019 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number ACTDC-5586214.), filed by Emmanuel Cruz Martinez.(Bhandary-Alexander, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz Martinez v. Charles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Homan
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marcos Charles
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Michelle Lynn McConaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emmanuel Cruz Martinez
Represented By: James Bhandary-Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?