Mystic Days, LLC v. Chhatrala Mystic, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mystic Days, LLC
Defendant: Kherva, LLC and Chhatrala Mystic, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01953
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Amended Complaint Kherva, LLC served on The Secretary of the State, Agent for Service on 01/14/2020, filed by Mystic Days, LLC. (Block, Mark)
January 13, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Chhatrala Mystic, LLC to 1/13/2020 per doc. #9. (Freberg, B)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint for Chhatrala Mystic, LLC served on Lynanne Gares (Managing Agent) on 12/23/2019, filed by Mystic Days, LLC. (Block, Mark)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mystic Days, LLC.(Block, Mark)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE BASIS FOR FEDERAL JURISDICTION. Plaintiff has filed a diversity complaint that names limited liability companies as both plaintiff and defendants. For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a limited liability company is determined by reference to the citizenship of each of its members. See, e.g., Bayerische Landesbank, New York Branch v. Aladdin Capital Mgmt. LLC, 692 F.3d 42, 49 (2d Cir. 2012); Handelsman v. Bedford Village Ltd. Partnership, LLC, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000). The complaint fails to identify each of the members and the citizenship of each one of the limited liability company members. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by January 10, 2020, that properly identifies the membership and citizenship of each of the members of the relevant parties. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/13/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Chhatrala Mystic, LLC, Kherva, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Block* *Block, Janney & Sisley, LLC* *138 Main Street* *Norwich, CT 06360*. (Freberg, B)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Mystic Days, LLC, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2019.(Freberg, B)
December 12, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Block, Mark)
December 11, 2019 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mystic Days, LLC against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5587047.), filed by Mystic Days, LLC.(Block, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mystic Days, LLC v. Chhatrala Mystic, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kherva, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chhatrala Mystic, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mystic Days, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?