Fernandez v. Hearth Management LLC
Plaintiff: Belizabeth Fernandez
Defendant: Hearth Management LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01961
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER ON JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM. See attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/22/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
January 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 8077899. (D'Amato, Joseph)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the Parties' #17 Rule 26(f) Report. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except that the Parties' Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed in accordance with the deadlines and procedures set forth below. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Plaintiff may amend the pleadings and/or join additional parties by February 15, 2020. The Defendant may join additional parties and/or amend the pleadings by March 1, 2020. Discovery shall be completed by November 1, 2020. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by January 2, 2021. The Joint Trial Memorandum shall be filed by February 1, 2021, unless dispositive motions are filed, in which case it shall be filed within 45 days of the Court's ruling thereon. The Joint Trial Memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for November 10, 2020 at 2:00 PM. Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff may amend the pleadings and/or join additional parties by February 15, 2020Defendant may amend the pleadings and/or join additional parties by March 1, 2020Discovery due by November 1, 2020 Dispositive Motions due by January 2, 2021Joint Trial Memorandum due by February 1, 2021, unless dispositive motions are filed, in which case it shall be filed within 45 days of the Court's ruling thereonTelephonic Status Conference set for November 10, 2020 at 2:00 PM Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 1/22/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Michaud, Megan)
January 16, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Hearth Management LLC.(Skubas, Sarah)
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Belizabeth Fernandez (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Belizabeth Fernandez. (Michaud, Megan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Leigh Michaud on behalf of Belizabeth Fernandez (Michaud, Megan)
December 13, 2019 Answer deadline updated for Defendant Hearth Management LLC to 1/20/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Responsive pleading due by January 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/13/2019. (D'Amato, Joseph)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 20, 2020 In Which to Respond to Complaint by Hearth Management LLC. (Skubas, Sarah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Hearth Management LLC, #2 Notice of Statement Regarding Removal filed by Hearth Management LLC, #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Hearth Management LLC, #4 Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal filed by Hearth Management LLC, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Hearth Management LLC, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Standing Protective Order, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Hearth Management LLC Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 12/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020. Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/2019.(Fazekas, J.)
December 12, 2019 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Anastasio, F.)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hearth Management LLC. (Skubas, Sarah)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Hearth Management LLC Of Pending Motions (Skubas, Sarah)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Hearth Management LLC Certificate of Filing and Service of Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skubas, Sarah)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Skubas on behalf of Hearth Management LLC (Skubas, Sarah)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Hearth Management LLC Of Statement Regarding Removal (Skubas, Sarah)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hearth Management LLC from Hartfor Superior Court, case number HHD-CV-19-612473 S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5589395, filed by Hearth Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Skubas, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Hearth Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belizabeth Fernandez
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Represented By: Megan Leigh Michaud
Represented By: Andrew Brooks Farley Carnabuci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearth Management LLC
Represented By: Sarah R. Skubas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?