Casey et al v. Reliance Trust Company
Plaintiff: Jessica Casey and Jason Coleman
Defendant: Reliance Trust Company
Petitioner: Charles W. Santoro and Joseph Gault
Case Number: 3:2019mc00097
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Attorney(s) James L. Kauffman and Alex L. Serber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2019. (Bozek, M.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) James L. Kauffman and Alex L. Serber to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5450110) by Jessica Casey, Jason Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of James Kauffman, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Alex Serber)(Needham, Douglas)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Response to #1 MOTION to Quash (fee paid - amount: $47.00; Tracking Id: ACTDC-5398107) filed by Joseph Gault, Charles W. Santoro. (Lewis, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash (fee paid - amount: $47.00; Tracking Id: ACTDC-5398107) filed by Jessica Casey, Jason Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Document Subpoena to Sterling Investment Partners, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Ltr from Sterling Investment Partners to Plaintiffs re: Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Ex C - Ltr from Plaintiffs to Sterling Investment Partners, #4 Exhibit Ex D - Emails re: which Sterling entity has an investment in All My Sons, #5 Exhibit Ex E - Document Subpoena to Sterling Investment Partners III, L.P., #6 Exhibit Ex F - Sterling Investment Partners III L.Ps Response to Subpoena, #7 Exhibit Ex G - Emails re: Sterling IIIs responses to subpoena, #8 Exhibit Ex H - Emails re: service of subpoenas for Joseph Gault and Charles Santoro, #9 Exhibit Ex I - Charles Santoro and Joseph Gaults Objections and Responses to Subpoenas to Produce Documents)(Needham, Douglas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Patrick Needham on behalf of Jessica Casey, Jason Coleman (Needham, Douglas)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/13/2019.(Bozek, M.)
August 13, 2019 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Anastasio, F.)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey I.D. Lewis on behalf of Joseph Gault, Charles W. Santoro (Lewis, Jeffrey)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash (fee paid - amount: $47.00; Tracking Id: ACTDC-5398107) by Joseph Gault, Charles W. Santoro.Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Quash Plaintiffs Subpoenas to Non-Parties Charles Santoro and Joseph Gault, #2 Declaration of Mark A. Robertson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Lewis, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casey et al v. Reliance Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Casey
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Coleman
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles W. Santoro
Represented By: Jeffrey I.D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Gault
Represented By: Jeffrey I.D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?