Duffin et al v. Reliastar Life Ins Co
Plaintiff: Martha Duffin and Mary Kate Duffin
Defendant: Reliastar Life Ins Co
Case Number: 3:2019mc00098
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 08/14/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 08/14/2019.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:18-mc-00756.
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut for all further proceedings. Signed on 8/1/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #2 MOTION to change venue filed by Thomas R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Buchanan, Thomas)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Respondents request to lift the stay is granted. Furthermore, the Court implemented the stay prior to the motion to change venue being fully briefed. Respondent has up to and including July 9, 2019 to file its brief in reply to the motion to change venue. Signed on 6/25/2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (McIlvain, Kelly)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of filing of JOINT STATEMENT OF PARTIES RELATED TO STAY by Martha Duffin, Mary Kate Duffin re #9 Order (Herrington, Daniel)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The parties are directed to file a joint statement advising the Court whether the stay should be lifted, within 14 days. See Order for details. Signed on 5/24/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE. All deadlines are stayed pending resolution of the motion for judgment on the pleadings filed in the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut, at which time the parties are directed to file a notice with this Court. Signed on 12/07/2018 by District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (El-Zein, Anna)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to motion to Stay filed by Thomas R. Buchanan on behalf of Defendant Reliastar Life Insurance Company. Reply suggestions due by 11/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Buchanan, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing /NOTICE OF MOTION TO STAY ALL DISCOVERY ENTERED BY THE DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF CONNECTICUT by Martha Duffin, Mary Kate Duffin (Herrington, Daniel)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #2 MOTION to change venue filed by Daniel Owen Herrington on behalf of Plaintiffs Martha Duffin, Mary Kate Duffin. Reply suggestions due by 11/8/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Herrington, Daniel)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 : Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) is GRANTED, to October 25, 2018. Signed on 10/19/18 by District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) filed by Daniel Owen Herrington on behalf of Martha Duffin, Mary Kate Duffin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/1/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Herrington, Daniel)
October 4, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to change venue filed by Thomas R. Buchanan on behalf of Reliastar Life Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/18/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Thomas R. Buchanan added to party Reliastar Life Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Buchanan, Thomas)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT - This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Beth Phillips. Please note the case number: 4:18-00756-MC-W-BP. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to quash -Modify Subpoenas and for Protective Order filed by Kevin Mason on behalf of Martha Duffin, Mary Kate Duffin. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Mason, Kevin)
September 21, 2018 MISCELLANEOUS CASE Filing fee $47, receipt number AMOWDC-5950654.(Mason, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffin et al v. Reliastar Life Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliastar Life Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Duffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Kate Duffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?