Backmon v. John D'Amelia & Associates LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carla Backmon and Carla R Backmon
Defendant: John D'Amelia & Associates LLC, Housing Authority of the City of Danbury, Pat Kelson Associates, Inc., Southfield Village Limited Partnership II, Konover Residential Corp, BCJ Management Limited Partnership and Simon Konover Co
Case Number: 3:2020cv00006
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion To Correct Removed Superior Court Case To Reflect All Plaintiffs Three Parties And Correct Case Type As Tort by Carla R Backmon.Responses due by 2/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case Detail - FST-CV19-5022700-S)(Backmon, Carla)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/29/2020. (Oliver, T.)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #18 Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing; granting #19 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #20 Motion to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/29/2020. (Smith, E)
January 14, 2020 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Housing Authority of the City of Danbury. (McWeeny, Tucker)
January 14, 2020 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John D'Amelia & Associates LLC. (Kravetz, Karen)
January 14, 2020 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pat Kelson Associates, Inc.. (Seusing, Christopher)
January 10, 2020 Filing 50 Memorandum of Law in Support re #48 OBJECTION re 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carla Backmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 49 OBJECTION re #39 Notice of Appearance filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 48 OBJECTION re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 47 OBJECTION re #33 Notice filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 46 OBJECTION re #38 Notice filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 45 OBJECTION re #43 MOTION to Stay filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 44 Docket Entry Correction re #39 Notice of Appearance MODIFIED TO ADD REPLACEMENT PDF DOCUMENT TO THE DOCKET ENTRY (Oliver, T.)
January 9, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Stay by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Housing Authority of the City of Danbury, John D'Amelia & Associates LLC, Konover Residential Corp, Pat Kelson Associates, Inc., Simon Konover Co, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II.Responses due by 1/30/2020 (Kravetz, Karen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 42 Memorandum in Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND AND OBJECTIONS TO REMOVAL AND REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF REMOVAL re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Housing Authority of the City of Danbury, John D'Amelia & Associates LLC, Konover Residential Corp, Pat Kelson Associates, Inc., Simon Konover Co, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II. (Gfeller, Charles)
January 9, 2020 Filing 41 Memorandum in Support re #40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Housing Authority of the City of Danbury, John D'Amelia & Associates LLC, Konover Residential Corp, Pat Kelson Associates, Inc., Simon Konover Co, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II. (Kravetz, Karen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Housing Authority of the City of Danbury, John D'Amelia & Associates LLC, Konover Residential Corp, Pat Kelson Associates, Inc., Simon Konover Co, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II.Responses due by 1/30/2020 (Kravetz, Karen)
January 9, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Seusing on behalf of Pat Kelson Associates, Inc. (Seusing, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/10/2020: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Oliver, T.).
January 8, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE by Pat Kelson Associates, Inc. (Seusing, Christopher)
January 8, 2020 Filing 37 OBJECTION re #30 NOTICE by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II Notice of Defendants' Consent to Removal to Federal Court filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 36 OBJECTION re #29 NOTICE by Konover Residential Corp, Simon Konover Co re 1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Defendants' Consent to Removal to Federal Court filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 35 OBJECTION re #28 NOTICE by John D'Amelia & Associates LLC of Defendant's Consent to Removal to Federal Court filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Related Case by Carla Backmon (Oliver, T.)
January 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Housing Authority of the City of Danbury re #1 Notice of Removal, (McWeeny, Tucker)
January 8, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Tucker McWeeny on behalf of Housing Authority of the City of Danbury (McWeeny, Tucker)
January 8, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Szilagyi on behalf of Housing Authority of the City of Danbury (Szilagyi, Frank)
January 7, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II Notice of Defendants' Consent to Removal to Federal Court (Gfeller, Charles)
January 7, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Konover Residential Corp, Simon Konover Co re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Defendants' Consent to Removal to Federal Court (Myers, Sheldon)
January 7, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by John D'Amelia & Associates LLC of Defendant's Consent to Removal to Federal Court (Kravetz, Karen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to John D'Amelia & Associates LLC, Housing Authority of the City of Danbury, Simon Konover Co, Konover Residential Corp & Pat Kelson Associates, Inc. by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Pending Motions by Carla Backmon (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 24 OBJECTION re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 23 OBJECTION re #5 NOTICE by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II Statement of Compliance With Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carla Backmon. Responses due by 1/24/2020 (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Carla Backmon. Responses due by 1/24/2020 (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Carla Backmon. (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 Consent to Electronic Notice by Carla Backmon (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 16 Appearance Self Represented Party by Carla Backmon (Oliver, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam David Miller on behalf of John D'Amelia & Associates LLC (Miller, Adam)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Baldwin Kravetz on behalf of John D'Amelia & Associates LLC (Kravetz, Karen)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendants by Konover Residential Corp, Simon Konover Co. (Myers, Sheldon)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon D. Myers on behalf of Konover Residential Corp, Simon Konover Co (Myers, Sheldon)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Statement of Compliance with Standing Order on Removed Cases filed by Southfield Village Limited Partnership II, BCJ Management Limited Partnership, #10 Standing Protective Order, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Olivia Tawa on behalf of Southfield Village Limited Partnership II, BCJ Management Limited Partnership, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Southfield Village Limited Partnership II, BCJ Management Limited Partnership, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles Francis Gfeller on behalf of Southfield Village Limited Partnership II, BCJ Management Limited Partnership, #6 Notice of Appearance filed by Shrina B. Faldu on behalf of Southfield Village Limited Partnership II, BCJ Management Limited Partnership, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Southfield Village Limited Partnership II, BCJ Management Limited Partnership, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Southfield Village Limited Partnership II, BCJ Management Limited Partnership Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2020. Discovery due by 7/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/7/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Tawa on behalf of BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II (Tawa, Olivia)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shrina B. Faldu on behalf of BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II (Faldu, Shrina)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II Statement of Compliance With Standing Order on Removed Cases (Gfeller, Charles)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II Notice of Pending Motions (Gfeller, Charles)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II. (Gfeller, Charles)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Francis Gfeller on behalf of BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II (Gfeller, Charles)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II from Superior Court J.D. of Stamford at Stamford, case number FST-CV19-5022700 S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BCTDC-5617173, filed by BCJ Management Limited Partnership, Southfield Village Limited Partnership II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gfeller, Charles)
January 2, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backmon v. John D'Amelia & Associates LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John D'Amelia & Associates LLC
Represented By: Karen Baldwin Kravetz
Represented By: Adam David Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of the City of Danbury
Represented By: Karen Baldwin Kravetz
Represented By: Tucker McWeeny
Represented By: Frank J. Szilagyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Kelson Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Baldwin Kravetz
Represented By: Christopher Seusing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southfield Village Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Olivia Tawa
Represented By: Charles Francis Gfeller
Represented By: Shrina B. Faldu
Represented By: Karen Baldwin Kravetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konover Residential Corp
Represented By: Karen Baldwin Kravetz
Represented By: Sheldon D. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCJ Management Limited Partnership
Represented By: Olivia Tawa
Represented By: Charles Francis Gfeller
Represented By: Shrina B. Faldu
Represented By: Karen Baldwin Kravetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Konover Co
Represented By: Karen Baldwin Kravetz
Represented By: Sheldon D. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Backmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla R Backmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?