Innamorato et al v. QCP, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joann Innamorato and Joseph Innamorato
Defendant: Union Carbide Corp, DAVID FABRICATORS OF NEW YORK, INC., QCP, INC F/K/A BAKERS PRIDE OVEN COMPANY, INC, G.S. BLODGETT CORPORATION, Hennessey Industries LLC, Blodgett Corporation, Hennessey Industries, QCP, Inc. and Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00011
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time until March 10, 2020 to Oppose Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/19/2020. (Simon, K)
February 13, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2020 to Oppose Motion to Remand #27 First MOTION to Remand to State Court QCP, Inc. by QCP, Inc.. (Baldwin, Andrew)
January 31, 2020 Filing 27 First MOTION to Remand to State Court QCP, Inc. by Joann Innamorato, Joseph Innamorato.Responses due by 2/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #15 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Meisenkothen, Christopher)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #22 Motion to Stay; granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. All deadlines are extended for 60 days. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 1/27/2020. (Simon, K)
January 23, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 day extension to Submit Rule 26 F Report by Joseph Innamorato. (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
January 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stuart Ludlum on behalf of Blodgett Corporation (Ludlum, Robert)
January 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by John F. Rooney, III on behalf of Blodgett Corporation (Rooney, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay by Joseph Innamorato.Responses due by 2/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Meisenkothen, Christopher)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Attorney Joseph J. Welter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/15/2020. (Oliver, T.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph J. Welter to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5637704) by QCP, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Joseph J. Welter, Esq.)(Milrad, Joshua)
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 Docket Entry Correction re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment MODIFIED TO ADD REPLACEMENT PDF OF DOC 15-3 TO THE DOCKET ENTRY (Oliver, T.)
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christy E. Jachimowski on behalf of Union Carbide Corp (Jachimowski, Christy)
January 13, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #14 Notice (Other) MODIFIED TO NOTE ENTRY HAS BEEN ENTERED IN ERROR AND REDOCKETED AS DOC #17; ORIGINALLY EFILED USING THE INCORRECT EVENT (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by QCP, Inc.. (REPLACING DOC #14) (Oliver, T.)
January 10, 2020 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by QCP, Inc.. (Baldwin, Andrew)
January 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by QCP, Inc..Responses due by 1/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Thomas Nixon, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Joshua Milrad, Esq., #4 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit B - Answer to Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' responses to discovery requests, #7 Exhibit D - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit E - QCP's Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production, #9 Statement of Material Facts)(Baldwin, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2020: #10 REPLACEMENT PDF OF 15-3) (Oliver, T.).
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 ENTERED IN ERROR - NOTICE by QCP, Inc. of compliance with 7.1 (Baldwin, Andrew) Modified on 1/13/2020 (Oliver, T.).
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by QCP, Inc. of compliance with standing order on removed cases (Baldwin, Andrew)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Laurence Milrad on behalf of QCP, Inc. (Milrad, Joshua)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , CROSSCLAIM against Blodgett Corporation, David Fabricators of New York, Inc., Union Carbide Corp by QCP, Inc..(Baldwin, Andrew)
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Hennessey Industries. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Oliver, T.)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 Amended NOTICE by QCP, Inc. of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Hennessy Industries MSJ)(Baldwin, Andrew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 Amended Notice of Removal filed by QCP, Inc., #3 Notice of Pending Motions filed by QCP, Inc., #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by QCP, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by QCP, Inc. Of Pending Motions (Baldwin, Andrew) Modified on 1/3/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 Amended NOTICE by QCP, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal - State Court)(Baldwin, Andrew) Modified on 1/3/2020 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by QCP, INC F/K/A BAKERS PRIDE OVEN COMPANY, INC from Superior for the Judicial District of Fairfield, case number FBT-CV18-6079665-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5618095, filed by QCP, INC F/K/A BAKERS PRIDE OVEN COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings and Orders, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal - State Court)(Baldwin, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innamorato et al v. QCP, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corp
Represented By: Christy E. Jachimowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FABRICATORS OF NEW YORK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QCP, INC F/K/A BAKERS PRIDE OVEN COMPANY, INC
Represented By: Andrew L Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.S. BLODGETT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessey Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blodgett Corporation
Represented By: Robert Stuart Ludlum
Represented By: John F. Rooney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hennessey Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QCP, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Laurence Milrad
Represented By: Andrew L Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakers Pride Oven Company, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Laurence Milrad
Represented By: Andrew L Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Innamorato
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Innamorato
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?