Salama v. Progressive Casualty Ins Co et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Millet Salama
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Ins Co, Casey Insurance Group, Inc. and Casey Insurance Group Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00026
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Casey Insurance Group Inc. to 3/27/2020. (Johnson, D.)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Defendant Casey's motion (ECF No. #11 ) for an extension of time in which to file a response to the complaint is granted in part. Defendant Casey's response shall be filed by 3/27/20. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/28/20. (Constantine, A.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 OBJECTION re #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 17, 2020 to answer or respond to Plaintiffs complaint filed by Daniel Millet Salama. (Lennon, Patrick)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 17, 2020 to answer or respond to Plaintiffs complaint by Casey Insurance Group Inc.. (Sheehan, Cristin)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Cristin E. Sheehan on behalf of Casey Insurance Group Inc. (Sheehan, Cristin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Casey Insurance Group Inc. waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020 filed by Daniel Millet Salama. (Lennon, Patrick)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Progressive Casualty Ins Co waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020 filed by Daniel Millet Salama. (Lennon, Patrick)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Casey Insurance Group Inc., Progressive Casualty Ins Co* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick F. Lennon* *Lennon Murphy Caulfield & Phillips, LLC* *Tide Mill Landing, 2425 Post Road, Suite 302* *Southport, CT 06890*. (Peterson, M)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Daniel Millet Salama, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Daniel Millet Salama, #5 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 01/08/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Daniel Millet Salama re #1 Complaint civil cover sheet for Complaint filed 01/06/2020 (Lennon, Patrick)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/06/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/06/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2020. Discovery due by 7/7/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 01/06/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 6, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Walker, J.)
January 6, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Progressive Casualty Ins Co. (Lennon, Patrick)
January 6, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Casey Insurance Group, Inc.. (Lennon, Patrick)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5622885.), filed by Daniel Millet Salama.(Lennon, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salama v. Progressive Casualty Ins Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Millet Salama
Represented By: Patrick F. Lennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Insurance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Insurance Group Inc.
Represented By: Cristin E. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?