Doe v. University of Connecticut et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Brian Goepfrich and University of Connecticut
Case Number: 3:2020cv00092
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Cost and Fees by John Doe.Responses due by 3/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Atty Tara Knight, #3 Affidavit of Atty Avery Friedman, #4 Affidavit of Atty Andrew Feinstein, #5 Affidavit of Michael Thad Allen, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4)(Allen, Michael)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. The plaintiff's #33 motion for extension of time until March 10, 2020 to file his motion for attorneys' fees is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/20/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
February 18, 2020 Filing 33 First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2020 to file Fee Petition by John Doe. (Allen, Michael)
February 12, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 32 JUDGMENT filed and entered in accordance with the Consent Order.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 2/12/20.(Johnson, D.)
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by John Doe re #21 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction to Withdraw Notice of Intent to Request Redaction (Allen, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. As set forth in the attached, the Court hereby GRANTS the #29 Amended Motion for Consent Order, and DENIES as moot the #28 original motion for consent order. The Plaintiff shall submit any motion for attorneys' fees within 14 days of the date of this order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54. The Court hereby GRANTS the #3 motion to proceed anonymously as John Doe and the #4 motion to seal for substantially the reasons set forth in the memoranda filed in support of those motions (ECF Nos. [3-1] & [4-2]). The #2 Emergency Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction is TERMINATED, because the plaintiff has now withdrawn his request for a TRO and preliminary injunction (ECF No. [29-1] at 2). The hearing scheduled for February 19, 2020 is CANCELED. The Clerk is instructed to close this case and enter judgment in accordance with the terms of the Consent Order; the Court will retain jurisdiction to adjudicate any disputes as set forth in the Consent Order. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/11/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
February 10, 2020 Filing 29 Amended MOTION for Consent Order Order by Gregory Bouquot, Michael Gilbert, Brian Goepfrich, University of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Consent Order)(Lenehan, Mary)
February 10, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Consent Order Order by Gregory Bouquot, Michael Gilbert, Brian Goepfrich, University of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order)(Lenehan, Mary)
February 10, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Doe. Gregory Bouquot served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020; Michael Gilbert served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020; Brian Goepfrich served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020; Gilbert Michael served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020; University of Connecticut served on 2/2/2020, answer due 2/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Allen, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/19/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. The #24 consent motion to continue the preliminary injunction hearing is GRANTED. The hearing is RESCHEDULED to February 19, 2020 at 9:00 AM. (The Court is not available on 2/18.) The parties shall file witness lists and exhibits by February 12, 2020, and shall deliver to chambers courtesy copies of all exhibits by February 14, 2020.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/5/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
February 5, 2020 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Gregory Bouquot, Michael Gilbert, Brian Goepfrich, University of Connecticut. (Lenehan, Mary)
February 5, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kathryn Lenehan on behalf of Gregory Bouquot, Michael Gilbert (Lenehan, Mary)
February 5, 2020 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Gregory Bouquot, Michael Gilbert, Brian Goepfrich, University of Connecticut* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Thad Allen* *Allen Law, LLC* *PO Box 404* *Quaker Hill, CT 06375*. (Peterson, M)
February 5, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Allen, Michael)
January 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Michael Thad Allen re #20 Transcript,,,, (Allen, Michael)
January 30, 2020 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Type of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1-23-2020 before Judge Michael P. Shea. Court Reporter: Julie Monette. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2020. (Monette, Julie)
January 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/11/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
January 23, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 2/4/2020 (Johnson, D.)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. For the reasons set forth in the attached, the Plaintiff's #2 motion for a Temporary Restraining Order is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/23/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael P. Shea: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/23/2020. Total Time: 1 hours and 12 minutes(Court Reporter J. Monette.) (Johnson, D.)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. As discussed during today's telephonic status conference, the Court expects to grant the plaintiff's #2 motion for a temporary restraining order (TRO), provided that the plaintiff files an amended complaint by 5:00 PM today that names appropriate parties over whom the Court has jurisdiction and who have authority to effectuate the relief he is seeking. If the plaintiff wishes to make any further amendments to the complaint, he shall advise defendants' counsel of his further proposed amendments by 12:00 PM on January 28, 2020. The plaintiff shall file any further amendments by 12:00 PM on January 29, 2020.The defendants may respond to the plaintiff's #2 motion by February 4, 2020. No reply will be permitted. The Court will hold an evidentiary hearing on the plaintiff's #2 motion for a preliminary injunction on February 11, 2020 at 9:00 AM. To the extent necessary, the hearing will continue to February 12, 2020. Prior to February 5, 2020, the parties shall confer regarding witness lists and exhibits for the hearing. By 5:00 PM on February 5, 2020, the parties shall jointly file their witness lists and exhibits, and they shall indicate any objections the parties have to witnesses or exhibits. The parties may list student witnesses by pseudonym or initials, but shall provide a description of who each witness is (e.g., "plaintiff's roommate"). By 12:00 PM on February 7, 2020, the parties shall deliver to chambers two courtesy copies of all exhibits, each placed in a three-ring binder with a copy of the exhibit list at the front of the binder and each exhibit separately tabbed. The parties shall deliver the original set of exhibits along with an exhibit list to the Courtroom Deputy. Deadlines for the submission of post-hearing proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law will be set at the close of the hearing. If the parties are both interested in mediation with a Magistrate Judge, they shall file a joint statement so indicating by 5:00 PM on January 24, 2020. If nothing is filed, the Court will assume that at least one party is not interested in mediation at this time. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/23/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants, filed by John Doe.(Allen, Michael)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Because an appearance has been entered for both defendants (ECF No. #13 ), the Court's January 21, 2020 Order of expedited service (ECF No. 12) is VACATED. The plaintiff may serve the defendants as required by law in the ordinary course. The January 23, 2020 telephonic status conference will proceed as ordered. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/22/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kathryn Lenehan on behalf of Brian Goepfrich, University of Connecticut in Brian Goepfrich's official capacity (Lenehan, Mary)
January 21, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. By 5:00pm on January 22, 2020, the Plaintiff shall serve (and file proof of service on the docket) the #1 Complaint and the #2 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and the supporting papers on (1) the Office of the Attorney General, (2) Assistant Attorney General Ralph Urban, and (3) UCONN's General Counsel, Nicole Gelston. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference call on January 23, 2020 at 10:00am to discuss the emergency motion. Chambers will provide dial-in information to Plaintiff's counsel, who shall make diligent efforts to ensure that counsel representing the defendants are on the call. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 1/21/2020. (Hausmann, Amy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 11 Amended AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction of Michael Thad Allen served on University of Connecticut and Brian Goepfrich on 1/20/2020, filed by John Doe. (Allen, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Sealed Document: Affidavit of John Doe with Sealed Exhbits A, B, C, D, F, H, I, J, L, M, and N by John Doe re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit L, #10 Exhibit M, #11 Exhibit N)(Allen, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Proposed Order filed by John Doe, #8 Protective Order, #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe, #3 MOTION leave to proceed under pseudonym "John Doe" filed by John Doe, #4 MOTION to Seal Affidavit of John Doe, Ex. A, Ex. B, Ex. C, Ex. D, Ex. F, Ex. H, Ex. I, Ex. J, Ex. L, Ex. M, Ex. N filed by John Doe, #1 Complaint filed by John Doe Signed by Clerk on 01/21/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/20/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 01/20/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2020. Discovery due by 7/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 01/20/2020. (Peterson, M)
January 20, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
January 20, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John Doe. (Allen, Michael)
January 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal Affidavit of John Doe, Ex. A, Ex. B, Ex. C, Ex. D, Ex. F, Ex. H, Ex. I, Ex. J, Ex. L, Ex. M, Ex. N by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of John Doe Redacted, #3 Exhibit to be filed under seal)(Allen, Michael)
January 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION leave to proceed under pseudonym "John Doe" by John Doe.Responses due by 2/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Allen, Michael)
January 20, 2020 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit under Rule 65(b) of Michael Thad Allen in Support, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Affidavit of John Doe, #4 Exhibit A-P)(Allen, Michael)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5646486.), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civil Action Cover Sheet)(Allen, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. University of Connecticut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Goepfrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Michael Thad Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?