Feliciano-Cordero v. New Opportunities, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yahjaira Feliciano-Cordero
Defendant: New Opportunities, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00094
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 10 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until April 20, 2020 In Which to Respond to Complaint by New Opportunities Inc. (Salazar-Austin, David)
February 19, 2020 Answer deadline updated for New Opportunities Inc to March 19, 2020. (Leon, Noel)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time until March 19, 2020, for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/19/2020. (Leon, Noel)
February 18, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/3/2020 (Perez, J.)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 19, 2020 In Which to Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by New Opportunities Inc. (Salazar-Austin, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Salazar-Austin on behalf of New Opportunities Inc (Salazar-Austin, David)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *New Opportunities Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James V. Sabatini* *Sabatini & Associates* *One Market Square* *Newington, CT 06111*. (Fazekas, J.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Yahjaira Feliciano-Cordero Signed by Clerk on 01/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2020. Discovery due by 7/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 01/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
January 20, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
January 20, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to New Opportunities, Inc.. (Sabatini, James)
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New Opportunities, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5646870.), filed by Yahjaira Feliciano-Cordero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sabatini, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feliciano-Cordero v. New Opportunities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahjaira Feliciano-Cordero
Represented By: James V. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Opportunities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?