Walker v. Nicholas et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Walker
Defendant: Jane King and John Nicholas
Case Number: 3:2020cv00118
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; GRANTING #16 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/19/20. (Payton, R.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 17 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joseph Walker. (Bozek, M.)
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph Walker. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge, #2 envelope)(Bozek, M.)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Clarification. Based on Mr. Walker's representations in his motions, it appears he never received the Court's previous #13 denying his motion for counsel. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to re-send the #13 Order, dated Feb. 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/4/2020. (Garcia, A.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Clarification re #13 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel by Joseph Walker. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(Bozek, M.)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. For the reasons stated in the attached order, the motion to appoint counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/26/2020. (Garcia, A.)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #10 Motion to Proceed informa pauperis. Although you have sworn under penalty of perjury that the responses in the IFP application are truthful, the responses in question 6 do not accurately reflect the deposits shown on your Inmate Account Statement. Please file a new IFP application. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 3/16/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/24/20.(Payton, R.)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joseph Walker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Walker. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Peterson, M)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 2/20/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 1/30/2020.(Payton, R.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/27/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 1/27/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/27/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 PRISCS - MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Joseph Walker. (Bozek, M.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph Walker. (Bozek, M.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joseph Walker. (Bozek, M.) Modified on 1/29/2020 to correct docket text (Bozek, M.).
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Joseph Walker. (Bozek, M.)
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Jane King, John Nicholas, filed by Joseph Walker. (Attachments: #1 exhibits, #2 envelope)(Bozek, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Nicholas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?