Cook v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Robert Cook
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and CIGNA Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00139
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Set Deadline: 26(f) Report due by 5/8/2020. See 14 Order. (Bozek, M.)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the #13 consent motion for an extension of time for the parties to file the 26(f) report of the parties' planning meeting to and including May 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 3/3/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2020 to File Report of Parties' Planning Meeting by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana)
February 26, 2020 Answer deadline updated for CIGNA Corporation to 4/24/2020. See 12 Order. (Bozek, M.)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the #9 motion for extension of time for the defendant, Cigna Corp., to file a response to the complaint, absent objection. The time for Cigna Corp. to file its response is hereby extended to and including April 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/26/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement Cigna Corporation by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement Life Insurance Company of North America by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Begos, Patrick)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until April 24, 2020 Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint, by CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to CIGNA Corporation waiver sent on 2/25/2020; Life Insurance Company of North America waiver sent on 2/25/2020 filed by CIGNA Corporation; Life Insurance Company of North America. (Greco, Ivana)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America (Begos, Patrick)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivana Deyrup Greco on behalf of CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America (Greco, Ivana)
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Bozek, M.)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Robert Cook, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 1/31/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2020. Discovery due by 8/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/31/2020.(Bozek, M.)
January 31, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 31, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Ellis, Hudson)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CIGNA Corporation, Life Insurance Company of North America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5668527.), filed by Robert Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit EBA Letter with Additional Records to LINA dated 08-15-19, #3 Exhibit EBA 7-Day Letter to LINA dated 09-30-19)(Ellis, Hudson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Cook
Represented By: Hudson Taylor Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Ivana Deyrup Greco
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIGNA Corporation
Represented By: Ivana Deyrup Greco
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?