Walcott v. Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonja Walcott
Defendant: Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc. and Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00143
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc. to 4/1/2020. (Freberg, B)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/1/2020 respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/18/2020. (Freberg, B)
March 17, 2020 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/1/2020 respond to complaint by Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc.. (Hardiman, Jeffrey)
March 3, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc. to 3/18/2020. (Freberg, B)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2020 file responsive pleading to complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/3/2020. (Freberg, B)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until March 18, 2020 file responsive pleading to complaint by Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc.. (Hardiman, Jeffrey)
February 28, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Hardiman on behalf of Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc. (Hardiman, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonja Walcott. Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc. served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Lavery, David)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Faber Lavery* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center* *60 Popieluszko Court* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Freberg, B)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Sonja Walcott, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Sonja Walcott. Signed by Clerk on 2/3/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/31/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/31/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2020; Discovery due by 8/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 9/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 1/31/2020.(Freberg, B)
January 31, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Gentes on behalf of Sonja Walcott (Gentes, Jeffrey)
January 31, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc.. (Lavery, David) Modified to update party on 2/3/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5669096.), filed by Sonja Walcott.(Lavery, David) Modified to update party on 2/3/2020 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walcott v. Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Residential Mortgage Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Mortgage Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hardiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Walcott
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gentes
Represented By: David Faber Lavery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?