Young v. Comm. of Corr.
Plaintiff: Michael A. Young
Defendant: Comm. of Corr.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00194
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael A. Young. (Payton, R.)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct efile record re: #1 Notice of Removal, by Michael A. Young.Responses due by 4/10/2020 (Payton, R.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 11 EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael A. Young.Responses due by 4/3/2020 (Payton, R.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael A. Young (Payton, R.)
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. You must submit the attached Prisoner's IFP application which is being sent to you via U.S. mail. Also you must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 3/31/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 3/10/20.(Payton, R.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael A. Young. (Peterson, M)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael A. Young. (Peterson, M)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Michael A. Young. (Peterson, M)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency. You must submit the $400.00 filing fee or the attached Prisoner's IFP application. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 3/6/2020 Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 2/14/2020.(Payton, R.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/11/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/11/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/11/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael A. Young from Superior Court, Tolland, case number TSR-CV17-4008850-S., filed by Michael A. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 5, #2 Attachments 4 - 5, #3 Transcript)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 2/12/2020 to add prefix (Fazekas, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Comm. of Corr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comm. of Corr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?