Breen v. Colonial Van Lines, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jane Breen
Defendant: Beast Coast Moving, LLC and Colonial Van Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00195
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 21 Supplemental REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kenney, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The parties' revised 26(f) report was due by March 12, 2020. No revised report has been filed to date. The parties shall file a revised 26(f) report within 7 days. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/30/2020. (Karpman, Michael)
March 9, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE re 18 Order,,, as to Citizenship of Member(s) of Beast Coast Moving, LLC filed by Beast Coast Moving, LLC. (Kenney, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/12/2020 (Johnson, D.)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. As discussed during today's call, the parties are directed to file a revised 26(f) report by March 12, 2020. Also, as discussed, the notice of removal does not adequately allege the citizenship of Defendant Beast Coast Moving LLC. For limited liability companies, citizenship is determined by the citizenship of its members. See Handelsman v. Bedford Vill. Assocs. Ltd. P'ship, 213 F.3d 48, 51-52 (2d Cir. 2000) ("[F]or purposes of diversity jurisdiction, a limited liability company has the citizenship of its members.") Beast Coast is directed to file a statement of citizenship by March 9, 2020. The statement should indicate the citizenship of each of its members. If any member of Beast Coast is an LLC or a partnership, the statement of citizenship should also indicate the citizenship of that LLC or partnership. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/5/2020. (Karpman, Michael)
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael P. Shea: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/5/2020. 10 minutes(Court Reporter J. Monette.) (Johnson, D.)
March 2, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/6/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Michael P. Shea (Johnson, D.)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The telephonic status conference scheduled for March 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED for March 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/2/2020. (Karpman, Michael)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on March 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the parties Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 3/2/2020. (Karpman, Michael)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Kenney, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE re 10 Order,,,, filed by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Misty Rae Percifield on behalf of Jane Breen (Percifield, Misty)
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Ment on behalf of Jane Breen (Ment, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The #1 notice of removal does not adequately establish the Court's diversity jurisdiction. Specifically, the #1 notice of removal does not allege Plaintiff's citizenship. For individual parties, a notice of removal must allege either citizenship or domicile (from which the Court can infer citizenship). Alleging only residence is insufficient. See Leveraged Leasing Admin. Corp. v. PacifiCorp Capital, Inc., 87 F.3d 44, 46 (2d Cir. 1996) ("Because the complaint alleges only the residence, and not the citizenship, of some of the plaintiffs, we cannot determine whether diversity jurisdiction exists."); see also John Birch Soc. v. National Broadcasting Co., 377 F.2d 194, 199 (2d Cir. 1967) ("[I]t has long been held that a statement of residence, unlike domicile, tells the court only where the parties are living and not of which state they are citizens."). Within 14 days, Defendant shall file a statement of citizenship establishing complete diversity of citizenship. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 2/18/2020. (Karpman, Michael)
February 17, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Electronic Service Documents,, Response to 8-1 - Standing Order for Cases Removed from Superior Court filed by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc., #6 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc., 3 Notice 83.1,, #7 Protective Order, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 02/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc.. (Kenney, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/11/2020. (Peterson, M)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 02/11/2020. (Peterson, M)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2020. Discovery due by 8/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 02/11/2020. (Peterson, M)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 02/11/2020. (Peterson, M)
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc. Statement of no Pending Motions (Kenney, Michael)
February 11, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, J.D. of Hartford at Hartford, case number HHD-CV20-6122872-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5689050, filed by Beast Coast Moving, LLC, Colonial Van Lines, Inc..(Kenney, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breen v. Colonial Van Lines, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Breen
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Ment
Represented By: Misty Rae Percifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beast Coast Moving, LLC
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonial Van Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?