Smith v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert G. Smith
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., CBS Corp., General Electric Company, Elliot Company, Crane Co., CBS Corp and Alfa Laval Inc. AB
Case Number: 3:2020cv00217
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER re: Case Management PlanAmended Pleadings due by 4/30/2020. Discovery due by 3/29/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2021. Status Report due by 7/10/2020. Trial Brief due by 4/30/2021. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/10/2020. (Reis, Julia)
March 31, 2020 Filing 25 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lyons, Thomas)
March 9, 2020 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Alfa Laval Inc. AB, filed by Robert G. Smith.(Meisenkothen, Christopher)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is ordered to file an Amended Complaint on the docket by 3/9/2020 and to serve defendant within 60 days. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/3/2020. (Lewis, D)
March 2, 2020 Filing 22 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., CBS Corp, Elliot Company, Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
February 26, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/31/2020 (Lewis, D)
February 24, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE by Crane Co. Statement of Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases (Lyons, Thomas)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Joinder. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 2/24/2020. (Lewis, D)
February 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against General Electric Company by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
February 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Joinder by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mohan, Catherine)
February 21, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliot Company identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliot Company. (D'Agostino, Michael)
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Elliot Company.(D'Agostino, Michael)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Elliot Company (D'Agostino, Michael)
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Elliot Company (George, Wayne)
February 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Co., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co., #5 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Robert G. Smith, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #7 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Order, #8 Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co. Signed by Clerk on 02/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/14/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/14/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 02/14/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/14/2020 Discovery due by 8/15/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2020 Signed by Clerk on 02/14/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Cite in Party Defendant by Robert G. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 First Amended Complaint)(Anastasio, F.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Crane Co. re: Notice of Pending Motions (Lyons, Thomas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Co. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV-20-6093411-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5697151, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Friemoth, #3 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 1, #4 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 2, #5 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 3, #6 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 4, #7 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 5, #8 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 6, #9 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 1, #10 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 2, #11 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 3, #12 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 4, #13 Exhibit 4: Forman Pt. 5, #14 Exhibit 5: State Notice of Removal, #15 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Thomas)
February 14, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot Company
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval Inc. AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert G. Smith
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?