USA v. Parcel of Property Located at 112 Shore Road, Old Greenwich, Connecticut et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Parcel of Property Located at 112 Shore Road, Old Greenwich, Connecticut
Claimant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, Eveyln Llewellen and Michael Lonski
Case Number: 3:2020cv00223
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed on Michael Lonski. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed on Evelyn Llewellyn. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 CLAIM Verified by JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Forcella, Victoria)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/4/20. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/27/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 4, 2020 To File Verified Claim by Eveyln Llewellen. (Spears, Brian)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Eveyln Llewellen (Eastwood, Janna)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Spears on behalf of Eveyln Llewellen (Spears, Brian)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/04/2020 to File a Verified Claim by Michael Lonski. (Glasser, James)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James I. Glasser on behalf of Michael Lonski (Glasser, James)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Verified Claim, on consent, to 5/5/20. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/20/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/04/2020 to File a Verified Claim by JP Morgan Chase Bank. (Forcella, Victoria)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Lynn Forcella on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank (Forcella, Victoria)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Writ. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/27/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Writ of Entry by USA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Turbert, Julie)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Protective Order, #2 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by USA Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/18/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 18, 2020 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint of Forfeiture against One Parcel of Property Located at 112 Shore Road, Old Greenwich, Connecticut with all appurtenances and improvements thereon, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Turbert, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Parcel of Property Located at 112 Shore Road, Old Greenwich, Connecticut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Forcella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Eveyln Llewellen
Represented By: Janna Douville Eastwood
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Michael Lonski
Represented By: James I. Glasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parcel of Property Located at 112 Shore Road, Old Greenwich, Connecticut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Julie G. Turbert
Represented By: Leonard C. Boyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?