Kelley et al v. MailFinance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Myra Glassman, Paige Kelly, Barry Carr, Gregory Kelley, Moshe Davis and Marshall Mauer
Defendant: Neopost USA, Inc and MailFinance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00233
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #29 Bankruptcy Transcript, Entered in Error. (Fanelle, N.)
March 16, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fanelle, N.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 29 *Entered in Error* TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Pretrial Conference. Held on 9/17/2019 before Judge Julie A Manning. Court Reporter: Suzanne Beniot. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.) Modified on 3/16/2020 (Fanelle, N.).
March 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by All Plaintiffs (Rothgeb, Nicole)
February 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M. Rothgeb on behalf of Barry Carr, Moshe Davis, Myra Glassman, Gregory Kelley, Paige Kelly, Marshall Mauer (Rothgeb, Nicole)
February 20, 2020 Filing 26 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
February 18, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
February 18, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2020.(Fanelle, N.)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/18/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 2/18/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/18/2020 Discovery due by 8/19/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 9/23/2020 Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
February 18, 2020 Filing 20 Case electronically transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00758. Modified on 2/19/2020 TO CORRECT THE DATE FILED (Oliver, T.).
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 TRANSFERRED to the District of Connecticut the electronic file via email (las, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM Opinion: The Court grants Defendants' motion to transfer to the District of Connecticut. It is so ordered. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/29/2020. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(vcf, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Mailed notice (vcf, )
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by MailFinance, Inc., Neopost USA, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #15 , MOTION by Defendants MailFinance, Inc., Neopost USA, Inc. to dismiss Complaint #9 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Devroye, Jennifer)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE by Barry Carr, Moshe Davis, Myra Glassman, Gregory Kelley, Paige Kelly, Marshall Mauerin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants MailFinance, Inc., Neopost USA, Inc. to dismiss Complaint #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rowe, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Defendants' motion to dismiss complaint #9 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 3/25/2019; Reply is due by 5/2/2019. Court will rule by mail. In light of said briefing schedule, status hearing set for 3/26/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Barry Carr, Moshe Davis, Myra Glassman, Gregory Kelley, Paige Kelly, Marshall Mauer by Jeremy Michael Barr (Barr, Jeremy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-15581759. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eidel, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Jennifer Lynn Wyatt Devroye for presentment of motion to dismiss #9 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 3/21/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Devroye, Jennifer)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by MailFinance, Inc., Neopost USA, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Devroye, Jennifer)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendants MailFinance, Inc., Neopost USA, Inc. to dismiss Complaint (Devroye, Jennifer)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants MailFinance, Inc., Neopost USA, Inc. by Jennifer Lynn Wyatt Devroye (Devroye, Jennifer)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 3/26/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moshe Davis, Myra Glassman, Paige Kelly, Gregory Kelley, Marshall Mauer, Barry Carr as to Neopost USA, Inc. on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Rowe, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moshe Davis, Myra Glassman, Paige Kelly, Gregory Kelley, Marshall Mauer, Barry Carr as to MailFinance, Inc. on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Rowe, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants MailFinance, Inc., Neopost USA, Inc. (jjr, )
February 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Barry Carr, Moshe Davis, Myra Glassman, Gregory Kelley, Paige Kelly, Marshall Mauer by Josiah A. Groff (Groff, Josiah)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Barry Carr, Moshe Davis, Myra Glassman, Gregory Kelley, Paige Kelly, Marshall Mauer by Elizabeth L. Rowe (Rowe, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rowe, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint For Injunction, Declaratory Judgment And Other Relief filed by Moshe Davis, Myra Glassman, Paige Kelly, Gregory Kelley, Marshall Mauer, Barry Carr; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15454062. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Rowe, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley et al v. MailFinance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myra Glassman
Represented By: Nicole M. Rothgeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Kelly
Represented By: Nicole M. Rothgeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Carr
Represented By: Nicole M. Rothgeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Kelley
Represented By: Nicole M. Rothgeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Davis
Represented By: Nicole M. Rothgeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Mauer
Represented By: Nicole M. Rothgeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neopost USA, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MailFinance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?