Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. Dattco, Inc.
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: Dattco, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00234
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 7604
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. The Court APPROVES the parties' status report (Doc. #29 ) and requests that the parties submit a renewed status report by May 17, 2021. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/2/2021.(Freberg, B)
March 1, 2021 Filing 29 Joint STATUS REPORT AND MOTION FOR STAY AND MODIFICATION OF THE SCHEDULING ORDER by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Tsuda, Kenta)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER APPROVING STATUS REPORT (Doc. #27 ). The Court APPROVES the parties' joint status report, and the parties shall file another status report on or before March 1, 2021, during which time all scheduling obligations remain stayed. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/9/2021.(Freberg, B)
February 8, 2021 Filing 27 Joint STATUS REPORT AND MOTION FOR STAY AND MODIFICATION OF THE SCHEDULING ORDER by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Tsuda, Kenta)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Attorney Heather Govern to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 1/19/2021. (Freberg, B)
January 19, 2021 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Heather A. Govern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6314767) by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Govern, Heather)
January 19, 2021 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/8/2021 (Freberg, B)
January 13, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Attorney(s) Heather Govern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6324972) by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Govern, Heather)
January 8, 2021 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/8/2021. Total Time: 5 minutes (Court Reporter Diana Huntington) (Barry, Donna)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OF CONFERENCE AND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. On January 8, 2021, the Court held a telephone conference with counsel concerning the status of this case. In light of the parties' ongoing settlement discussions, the Court GRANTS the joint motion to stay and for modification of the scheduling order (Doc. #20 ). The Court adopts all of the scheduling dates as jointly proposed by the parties. Doc. #20-1. Counsel are requested to file a status report on or before February 8, 2021 and also should advise chambers at any time if referral to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference would be helpful. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 01/08/2021. (Johnson, R.)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Attorney Heather A. Govern to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 3/9/2021. Signed by Clerk on 1/8/2021. (Freberg, B)
January 8, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Stay and for Modification of the Scheduling Order by Dattco, Inc..Responses due by 1/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Revised Calendar)(Neeves, Diana)
January 7, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Heather A. Govern to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6314767) by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Tsuda, Kenta)
December 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 4:15 PM. The parties should use the following conference call dial-in number: 1-877-402-9753; access code: 8576007#. (Gutierrez, Y.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Neeves on behalf of Dattco, Inc. (Neeves, Diana)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Approval of Interim Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 7/20/2020. (Freberg, B)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Approval of Interim Discovery Deadlines by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc..Responses due by 8/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Discovery Calendar)(Tsuda, Kenta)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE SCHEDULING. The Court has reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #13) in which the parties seek to extend discovery until January 2022 and the filing of dispositive motions until February 2022. Based on the Court's review of the complaint and the lack of particular complexity to the allegations that buses were allowed to idle too long on specific dates, the Court concludes that the parties' proposed dates are too lengthy and that the parties can reasonably complete discovery within 10 months and file any dispositive motions within one year from today. All discovery shall be completed by April 30, 2021. Dispositive motions shall be filed by June 29, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by June 29, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. Based on these dates, counsel shall agree to any interim discovery dates such as for expert witness disclosure and depositions. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held at 4:15pm on January 8, 2021. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/26/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Tsuda, Kenta)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenta Tsuda on behalf of Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. (Tsuda, Kenta)
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Dattco, Inc..(Baroni, Megan)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dattco, Inc.. (Baroni, Megan)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Ray on behalf of Dattco, Inc. (Ray, James)
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. Baroni on behalf of Dattco, Inc. (Baroni, Megan)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dattco, Inc. waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 5/30/2020 filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc., #1 Complaint filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc., #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2020.(Freberg, B)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/19/2020.(Freberg, B)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/19/2020.(Freberg, B)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/19/2020; Discovery due by 8/20/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 9/24/2020. Signed by Clerk on 2/19/2020.(Freberg, B)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Rotenberg, Edan)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dattco, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5704260.), filed by Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Notice Letter)(Rotenberg, Edan)
February 19, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc. v. Dattco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dattco, Inc.
Represented By: Diana Neeves
Represented By: Megan E. Baroni
Represented By: James P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Law Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: Edan Rotenberg
Represented By: Heather A Govern
Represented By: Kenta Tsuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?