Windham v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Town of Windham
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Mallinckrodt LLC, Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, SpecGX LLC, Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation, Walmart, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc., John Kapoor, Actavis Inc, Actavis PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc and Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00241
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Fazekas, J.)
March 12, 2020 Acknowledgment of Receipt re: Case Transferred Out - Case transferred from Connecticut has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:20-op-45103, filed 03/12/2020. (Oliver, T.)
March 12, 2020 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (Oliver, T.)
March 3, 2020 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 03/03/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Edwin Dwyer on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Dwyer, Paul)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to respond to the Complaint until sixty (60) days after the JPMLs final decision regarding transfer of the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/26/2020. (Leon, Noel)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 60 days after the later of the filing of decision on motion to remand or JPML's final decision regarding transfer for Defendants, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Cephalon, Inc.; Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Johnson & Johnson; Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Endo Health Solutions Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc;1 Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis LLC; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; SpecGX LLC; McKesson Corporation; Cardinal Health, Inc.; AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation; CVS Health Corporation; CVS Pharmacy, Inc.; Rite Aid Corporation; Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.; and Walmart Inc.; and John Kapoor to respond to the Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chase, Terri)
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #7 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #5 Notice of Pending Motions filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #11 Standing Protective Order, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #8 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Town of Windham, Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Actavis LLC, Walmart, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John Kapoor, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Rite Aid Corporation Signed by Clerk on 02/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2020. Discovery due by 8/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 02/20/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time until April 15, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, John Kapoor, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Rite Aid Corporation, SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Town of Windham. (Anastasio, F.)
February 20, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, CIVIL COVER SHEET (Mohan, Catherine)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice of Pending Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Docket Sheet), #2 Exhibit B (Motion for Extension of Time))(Mohan, Catherine)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Notice of Removal Statement (Mohan, Catherine)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Mohan, Catherine)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Sheldon, Tara)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. from Superior Court Judicial District of Windham at Putnam, case number WWM-CV20-6019181-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5706910, filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Docket))(Mohan, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windham v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Patrick M. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Morgan DelMonico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas V. Daily
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Maureen Danehy Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Paul Edwin Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Represented By: Brian E. Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisource Bergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: David T. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Terri L. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Edwin Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Christopher R. Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kapoor
Represented By: Kurt M. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Wasil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Town of Windham
Represented By: Margaret B. Ferron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?