Anderson et al v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vanessa Anderson
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Elliott Company, Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., General Electric Company, CBS Corp and Crane Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00244
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 19 Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against CBS Corp, Elliott Company by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliott Company identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company. (George, Wayne)
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Affirmative Defenses by Elliott Company.(George, Wayne)
February 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne E. George on behalf of Elliott Company (George, Wayne)
February 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C. D'Agostino on behalf of Elliott Company (D'Agostino, Michael)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #10 motion to voluntarily dismiss Foster Wheeler, L.L.C., with prejudice. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/28/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #9 motion to voluntarily dismiss General Electric Co., with prejudice. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/28/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting the plaintiff's #8 motion to voluntarily dismiss Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., with prejudice. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/28/2020. (Sondergeld, C.)
February 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. re: Corrected Notice of Appearance (Lyons, Thomas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Foster Wheeler, L.L.C. by Vanessa Anderson.Responses due by 3/19/2020 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss General Electric Company by Vanessa Anderson.Responses due by 3/19/2020 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. by Vanessa Anderson.Responses due by 3/19/2020 (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crane Co., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co., #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Crane Co., #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Crane Co., and #6 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 2/21/2020.(Bozek, M.)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/21/2020. Discovery due by 8/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/2020.(Bozek, M.)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Crane Co. re: Notice of Pending Motions (Lyons, Thomas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crane Co. from Bridgeport Superior Court, case number FBT-CV-20-6093621-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5708825, filed by Crane Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2: Friemoth, #3 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 1, #4 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 2, #5 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 3, #6 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 4, #7 Exhibit 3: Sargent Pt. 5, #8 Exhibit 4: Forman (USCG Aff.), #9 Exhibit 5: Forman Pt. 1, #10 Exhibit 5: Forman Pt. 2, #11 Exhibit 5: Forman Pt. 3, #12 Exhibit 5: Forman Pt. 4, #13 Exhibit 6: State Notice of Removal, #14 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Thomas)
February 21, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Wayne E. George
Represented By: Michael C. D'Agostino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Anderson
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?