SELF, Inc. et al v. Wolcott
Plaintiff: SELF, Inc. and L & R Realty, Inc.
Defendant: Town of Wolcott
Case Number: 3:2020cv00252
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Town of Wolcott to 5/5/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 5/5/2020 to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Any future motion must comply with the good cause standard of the Local Rule. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/24/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/05/20 To Respond to Complaint #1 Complaint by Town of Wolcott. (McMahon, Jacqueline)
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Town of Wolcott (Gerarde, Thomas)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Patricia McMahon on behalf of Town of Wolcott (McMahon, Jacqueline)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Dane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number CCTDC-5755379) by L & R Realty, Inc., SELF, Inc.. (Dane, Stephen)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice in light of ECF No 9. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/18/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice s to Stephen Dane. Certificate of Good Standing due by 5/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/18/2020. (Murphy, Tatihana)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Dane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number CCTDC-5755379) by L & R Realty, Inc., SELF, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kirschner, Greg)
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephen Dane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (includes a request to waive the fee) by L & R Realty, Inc., SELF, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kirschner, Greg)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Town of Wolcott* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Greg J. Kirschner* *CT Fair Housing Center, Inc.* *60 Popieluszko Ct.* *Hartford, CT 06106*. (Peterson, M)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by L & R Realty, Inc., SELF, Inc., #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 2/25/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 02/24/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 02/24/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2020. Discovery due by 8/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 9/29/2020. Signed by Clerk on 02/24/2020.(Murphy, Tatihana)
February 24, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.)
February 24, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Town of Wolcott. (Kirschner, Greg)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Town of Wolcott ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5711647.), filed by L & R Realty, Inc., SELF, Inc..(Kirschner, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELF, Inc. et al v. Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELF, Inc.
Represented By: Greg J. Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L & R Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Greg J. Kirschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Wolcott
Represented By: Jacqueline Patricia McMahon
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?