Speer v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sheri Speer
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Bendett & McHugh, PC and JP Morgan Chase, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00325
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Clark on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. IN ADDITION TO COUNSEL OF RECORD (Clark, Sean)
April 23, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..Responses due by 5/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Noice to Pro Se, #11 Text of Rule 12, #12 Text of Rule 7)(Radshaw, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule (12)(B)(6) filed by Bendett & McHugh, PC, JP Morgan Chase, N.A.. (Rich, Brian)
April 17, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to #23 First MOTION to Dismiss Complant against Bendett & McHugh, P.C. filed by Bendett & McHugh, PC. (Knickerbocker, Jeffrey)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Extension of Time. Granted to date requested, or to 14 days after ruling on the pending motions to dismiss, whichever is earlier. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/17/2020. (Lewis, D)
April 14, 2020 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule (12)(B)(6), #23 First MOTION to Dismiss Complant against Bendett & McHugh, P.C. filed by Sheri Speer. (Reis, Julia)
April 14, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Rule 26f Conference and File Report by Sheri Speer. (Reis, Julia)
April 2, 2020 Filing 24 First NOTICE by Bendett & McHugh, PC re #23 First MOTION to Dismiss Complant against Bendett & McHugh, P.C. to Pro Se Litigants (Knickerbocker, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2020 Filing 23 First MOTION to Dismiss Complant against Bendett & McHugh, P.C. by Bendett & McHugh, PC.Responses due by 4/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - State Foreclosure Docket, #3 Exhibit Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C - Affidavit that BK Stay not in Effect, #5 Exhibit D - Motion to Open and Withdrawal, #6 Exhibit E - Notice of Judgment, #7 Exhibit F - Quit Claim Deed, #8 Exhibit G - Complaint, #9 Exhibit H - Aff of Facts On Land Records, #10 Exhibit I - Release of Lis Pendens)(Knickerbocker, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase, N.A. re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule (12)(B)(6) to Pro Se Litigant (Rich, Brian)
April 2, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule (12)(B)(6) filed by JP Morgan Chase, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F)(Rich, Brian)
April 2, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule (12)(B)(6) by JP Morgan Chase, N.A..Responses due by 4/23/2020 (Rich, Brian)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 23, 2020 to File A Responsive Pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal,. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/25/2020. (Lewis, D)
March 25, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 23, 2020 to File A Responsive Pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Radshaw, John)
March 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Radshaw, III on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (Radshaw, John)
March 24, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/24/2020 (Lewis, D)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2020 Response to Plaintiff's Complaint.SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/20/2020. (Lewis, D)
March 20, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Bendett & McHugh, PC to 4/2/2020. (Lewis, D)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2020 Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Bendett & McHugh, PC. (Knickerbocker, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2020 to File Responsive Pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal,. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/18/2020. (Lewis, D)
March 18, 2020 Answer deadline updated for JP Morgan Chase, N.A. to 4/2/2020. (Lewis, D)
March 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 2, 2020 to File Responsive Pleading to the Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by JP Morgan Chase, N.A.. (Rich, Brian)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker on behalf of Bendett & McHugh, PC (Knickerbocker, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by JP Morgan Chase, N.A., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by JP Morgan Chase, N.A., #3 Notice (Other) filed by JP Morgan Chase, N.A., #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by JP Morgan Chase, N.A., #5 Notice (Other) filed by JP Morgan Chase, N.A., #6 Notice (Other) filed by JP Morgan Chase, N.A., #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Standing Protective Order, #10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/11/2020. (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/11/2020. (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 3/11/2020. (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2020. Discovery due by 9/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/11/2020. (Reis, Julia)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, Statement Pursuant to Standing Order in Removed Cases (Rich, Brian)
March 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rich, Brian)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase, N.A.. (Rich, Brian)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by JP Morgan Chase, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of No Pending Motions in State Court (Rich, Brian)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian D. Rich on behalf of JP Morgan Chase, N.A. (Rich, Brian)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JP Morgan Chase, N.A. from New London Superior Court, case number KNL-CV-20-5021328-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5743167, filed by JP Morgan Chase, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rich, Brian)
March 11, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speer v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Represented By: Sean P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendett & McHugh, PC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Knickerbocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase, N.A.
Represented By: Brian D. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?