Community Association Underwriters of America v. Torrington Water Company
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters of America
Defendant: Torrington Water Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00327
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Torrington Water Company to 5/22/2020. (Ferguson, L.)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. #9 ) is hereby GRANTED up to and including May 22, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/23/2020. (Brambila, N.)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until May 22, 2020 to file a Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint by Torrington Water Company. (Gerarde, Thomas)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Gerarde on behalf of Torrington Water Company (Gerarde, Thomas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Community Association Underwriters of America. Torrington Water Company served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Baldwin, Sharon)
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Torrington Water Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Sharon Baldwin* *Blackburn & Donnelly, LLC* *2 Concorde Way, Suite 3c, Post Office Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Agati, Kathryn)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Community Association Underwriters of America, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/12/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/11/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/11/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2020, Discovery due by 9/10/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/11/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
March 11, 2020 Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Torrington Water Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5743694.), filed by Community Association Underwriters of America .(Baldwin, Sharon) Modified on 3/12/2020 to update parties (Anastasio, F.).
March 11, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Torrington Water Company. (Baldwin, Sharon) Modified on 3/12/2020 to update party (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Association Underwriters of America v. Torrington Water Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrington Water Company
Represented By: Thomas R. Gerarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Association Underwriters of America
Represented By: Sharon Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?