NDT Systems, Inc. et al v. Kennametal Inc.
Plaintiff: NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc. and Wood Group USA, Inc.
Defendant: Kennametal Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00340
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Marie Mosites on behalf of Kennametal Inc. (Mosites, Jean)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Attorney Jean M. Mosites to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Attorney Alana Fortna to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/20/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean A. Hanafin on behalf of Kennametal Inc. (Hanafin, Dean)
April 17, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jean M. Mosites to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5809414) by Kennametal Inc.. (Bennett, Neyah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Alana Fortna to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5809401) by Kennametal Inc.. (Bennett, Neyah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Neyah K. Bennett on behalf of Kennametal Inc. (Bennett, Neyah)
April 14, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc.. (Thomsen, Martha)
April 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Thomsen on behalf of NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc. (Thomsen, Martha)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lily N. Chinn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5748658), #13 MOTION for Attorney(s) to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc.. (Chinn, Lily)
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Lily N Chinn on behalf of NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc. (Chinn, Lily)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Attorney Martha Thomsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/8/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2020. (Velez, F.)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Attorney Lily N. Chinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/8/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/9/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Martha Thomsen (Renewed Motion for) Order by NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Martha Thomsen, Esq.)(Silvestri, Frank) Modified on 4/9/2020 to correct motion relief (Velez, F.).
March 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lily N. Chinn (Renewed Motion for) Order by NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lily N. Chinn, Esq.)(Silvestri, Frank) Modified on 4/9/2020 to correct event to Motion relief (Velez, F.).
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kennametal Inc. waiver sent on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020 filed by NDT Systems, Inc.; Wood Group US Holdings, Inc.; Wood Group USA, Inc.. (Silvestri, Frank)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 and #10 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to refiling. D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 83.1(d)(1)(b) requires that a proposed visiting attorney state in an affidavit the bar identification number of each court of which she or he is and has ever been a member, and, if no number has been assigned by any given court, so stating. These motions to appear pro hac vice do not include bar numbers for every bar of which the proposed visiting attorneys are or ever have been members, and also do not state that no bar numbers were assigned by those bars for which numbers were omitted. Therefore, the Court cannot grant the motions. Counsel may re-file the motions with the necessary information included on or before 4/7/2020. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/24/2020. (Dannenmaier, Katherine)
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Martha Thomsen, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5748723) by NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Martha Thomsen, Esq.)(Silvestri, Frank)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Lily N. Chinn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5748658) by NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lily N. Chinn, Esq.)(Silvestri, Frank)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Standing Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wood Group USA, Inc., NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Wood Group USA, Inc., NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., #7 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #1 Complaint, filed by Wood Group USA, Inc., NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., #5 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/13/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/13/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/13/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/12/2020; Discovery due by 9/12/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 3/13/2020. (Velez, F.)
March 13, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wood Group US Holdings, Inc. for NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent JWGUSA Holdings, Inc. for Wood Group US Holdings, Inc.. (Silvestri, Frank)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Silvestri, Jr on behalf of NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc. (Silvestri, Frank)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kennametal Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5747935.), filed by NDT Systems, Inc., Wood Group USA, Inc., Wood Group US Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice to U.S. Attorney General and EPA Administrator)(Silvestri, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NDT Systems, Inc. et al v. Kennametal Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NDT Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Frank J. Silvestri, Jr.
Represented By: Martha Thomsen
Represented By: Lily N Chinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wood Group US Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Frank J. Silvestri, Jr.
Represented By: Martha Thomsen
Represented By: Lily N Chinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wood Group USA, Inc.
Represented By: Frank J. Silvestri, Jr.
Represented By: Martha Thomsen
Represented By: Lily N Chinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennametal Inc.
Represented By: Jean Marie Mosites
Represented By: Neyah K. Bennett
Represented By: Dean A. Hanafin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?