Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Health Fund et al v. East West Mechanical, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Connecticut State Pension Fund, National Pension Fund, United Association of Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 777, International Training Fund, Annuity Fund, Apprentice Training Fund, Industry Fund and Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Health Fund
Defendant: David Taft and East West Mechanical, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00450
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Industry Fund, Connecticut State Pension Fund, International Training Fund, United Association of Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 777, Annuity Fund, National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Health Fund, Apprentice Training Fund. East West Mechanical, LLC served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020; David Taft served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Campora, Gregory)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *East West Mechanical, LLC, David Taft* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory S. Campora* *Robert M. Cheverie & Associates* *333 East River Drive, Suite 101* *East Hartford, CT 06108-4206*. (Oliver, T.)
April 3, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to East West Mechanical, LLC, David Taft. (Campora, Gregory)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint,, filed by Apprentice Training Fund, Industry Fund, Annuity Fund, National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Health Fund, Connecticut State Pension Fund, International Training Fund, United Association of Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 777, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 04/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 04/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020. Discovery due by 10/2/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 2, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against East West Mechanical, LLC, David Taft ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5782079.), filed by Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Industry Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Connecticut State Pension Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters International Training Fund, United Association of Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 777, Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Annuity Fund, Plumbers & Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Health Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Pension Fund, Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Apprentice Training Fund.(Campora, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Health Fund et al v. East West Mechanical, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connecticut State Pension Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Pension Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Association of Plumbers and Pipefitters Local 777
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Training Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annuity Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apprentice Training Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industry Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Connecticut Pipe Trades Local 777 Health Fund
Represented By: Gregory S. Campora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Taft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East West Mechanical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?