C. v. Middletown Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: C.
Defendant: Amy Clarke, Middletown Board of Education, Michael T. Conner and Deborah Cain
Case Number: 3:2020cv00512
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Defendant to 6/29/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting on consent #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before June 29, 2020. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/9/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 29, 2020 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint, by Middletown Board of Education. (Murphy, Peter)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joseph Murphy on behalf of Middletown Board of Education (Murphy, Peter)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion to File Under Pseudonym. The Court grants the motion to proceed by way of pseudonym. See Sealed Plaintiff v. Sealed Defendant, 537 F.3d 185 (2d Cir. 2008). The Court advises the parties however that the balancing of factors required under the Sealed Plaintiff decision may counsel a different outcome at later stages of the litigation. If the Court, sua sponte, reconsiders this issue, the parties will be given notice and an opportunity to be heard. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/18/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 In light of the #9 Voluntary Dismissal filed, the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the following defendants: Deborah Cain, Michael T. Conner, and Amy Clarke. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 5/18/2020. (D'Amato, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Defendants by C..Responses due by 6/8/2020 (Spencer, Courtney) Modified on 5/18/2020 (Gould, K.).
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Deborah Cain waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Michael T. Conner waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Middletown Board of Education waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020; Amy Clarke waiver sent on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020 filed by C.. (Spencer, Courtney)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Deborah Cain, Amy Clarke, Michael T. Conner, Middletown Board of Education* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Courtney Paige Spencer* *Law Office of Courtney P. Spencer, LLC* *100 Riverview Center, Suite 120* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by C., #2 MOTION Motion to File Under Pseudonym filed by C., #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 04/16/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 04/16/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 04/16/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/15/2020. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/16/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
April 16, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION Motion to File Under Pseudonym by C..Responses due by 5/7/2020 (Spencer, Courtney)
April 16, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Spencer, Courtney)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deborah Cain, Amy Clarke, Michael T. Conner, Middletown Board of Education ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5805889.), filed by C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Appendix A)(Spencer, Courtney) Modified on 4/16/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. v. Middletown Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middletown Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael T. Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.
Represented By: Courtney Paige Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?