Pritchard v. Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beth A. Pritchard
Defendant: Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00541
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/22/2020; dispositive motions due by 1/22/2021; joint trial memorandum due by 2/22/2021; trial ready date 3/22/2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/03/20.(Codeanne, K.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc., filed by Beth A. Pritchard.(DeMatteis, Amanda)
June 2, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gramlich, Michelle)
May 8, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc. to 6/12/2020. See 13 Order. (Bozek, M.)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 motion for extension of time to and including June 12, 2020, within which to file a pleading in response to the plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 05/07/20. (Codeanne, K.)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/12/2020 Plead #1 Complaint by Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc.. (Gramlich, Michelle)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Ann Boyce Iassogna on behalf of Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc. (Iassogna, Patricia Ann)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Gramlich on behalf of Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc. (Gramlich, Michelle)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Beth A. Pritchard. Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc. served on 4/27/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (DeMatteis, Amanda)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Amanda Maria DeMatteis* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Beth A. Pritchard, #1 Complaint filed by Beth A. Pritchard, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Beth A. Pritchard, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Beth A. Pritchard Signed by Clerk on 04/22/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 04/22/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/21/2020 Discovery due by 10/22/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 11/26/2020 Signed by Clerk on 04/22/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 22, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Lee on behalf of Beth A. Pritchard (Lee, Elisabeth)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Goodbaum on behalf of Beth A. Pritchard (Goodbaum, Joshua)
April 22, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to EASTERSEALS CAPITAL REGION and EASTERN CONNECTICUT, INC.. (DeMatteis, Amanda)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Maria DeMatteis on behalf of Beth A. Pritchard (DeMatteis, Amanda)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EASTERSEALS CAPITAL REGION and EASTERN CONNECTICUT, INC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5815488.), filed by Beth A. Pritchard.(DeMatteis, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchard v. Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth A. Pritchard
Represented By: Joshua R. Goodbaum
Represented By: Elisabeth Lee
Represented By: Amanda Maria DeMatteis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easterseals Capital Region & Eastern Connecticut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?