Sachs v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Howard Sachs
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00570
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 4:00 PM Discovery due by 12/31/2020 Following a pre-filing conference, Dispositive Motions due by 1/25/2021 Status Report due by 11/24/2020 Trial Ready Date 6/1/2021.(Tooker, Aimee)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Force, Brenna)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Citizens Financial Group, Inc..(Millsom, Geoffrey)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet Bond Arterton for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/1/2020. (Reis, Julia)
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Citizens Financial Group, Inc., #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Citizens Financial Group, Inc., #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Citizens Financial Group, Inc., #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #6 Standing Protective Order, #7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/28/2020. (Reis, Julia)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/28/2020. (Reis, Julia)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 4/28/2020. (Reis, Julia)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2020. Discovery due by 10/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2020. (Reis, Julia)
April 28, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey W. Millsom on behalf of Citizens Financial Group, Inc. (Millsom, Geoffrey)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citizens Financial Group, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Citizens Bank, N.A. for Citizens Financial Group, Inc.. (Force, Brenna)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Citizens Financial Group, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, Judicial District of New Haven at New Haven, case number NNH-CV20-6103263-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5826069, filed by Citizens Financial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit 2 - Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Force, Brenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sachs v. Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Sachs
Represented By: Mark L. Bergamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey W. Millsom
Represented By: Brenna Anatone Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?