Rivera Vargas et al v. Best Auto Sales LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Rodriguez Quintana and Stephanie Rivera Vargas
Defendant: United Auto Credit Corporation and Best Auto Sales LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00571
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Charles S Haight
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Rivera Vargas, Kevin Rodriguez Quintana. United Auto Credit Corporation served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Rivera Vargas, Kevin Rodriguez Quintana. Best Auto Sales LLC served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Best Auto Sales LLC, United Auto Credit Corporation* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Kevin Rodriguez Quintana, Stephanie Rivera Vargas, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 04/28/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2020 Discovery due by 10/28/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2020 Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 28, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
April 28, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to United Auto Credit Corporation. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Best Auto Sales LLC. (Blinn, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Best Auto Sales LLC, United Auto Credit Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5826131.), filed by Stephanie Rivera Vargas, Kevin Rodriguez Quintana.(Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera Vargas et al v. Best Auto Sales LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Rodriguez Quintana
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rivera Vargas
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Auto Sales LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?