Luxottica Group SPA v. Bristol Grocery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group SPA
Defendant: Bristol Grocery, LLC and Tahir Hussain
Case Number: 3:2020cv00582
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Tahir Hussain waiver sent on 5/1/2020, answer due 6/30/2020 filed by Luxottica Group SPA. (Sullivan, Bradford)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bristol Grocery, LLC waiver sent on 5/1/2020, answer due 6/30/2020 filed by Luxottica Group SPA. (Sullivan, Bradford)
June 15, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Sullivan, Bradford)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Luxottica Group SPA Notice of Election of Statutory Damages (Sullivan, Bradford)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Peterson, M)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Luxottica Group SPA, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Luxottica Group SPA Signed by Clerk on 04/30/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/29/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 04/29/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2020. Discovery due by 10/29/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2020. Signed by Clerk on 04/29/2020. (Peterson, M)
April 29, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Luxottica Group SPA. (Sullivan, Bradford) Modified on 4/29/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bristol Grocery, LLC, Tahir Hussain ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BCTDC-5829117.), filed by Luxottica Group SPA.(Sullivan, Bradford) Modified on 4/29/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luxottica Group SPA v. Bristol Grocery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luxottica Group SPA
Represented By: Bradford J. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Grocery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahir Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?