Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc. v. AJ's Apizza, LLC
Plaintiff: Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc.
Defendant: AJ's Apizza, LLC d/b/a Grand Apizza Deep River
Case Number: 3:2020cv00604
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Stefan R. Underhill: granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time; Status Conference held on 6/25/2020. Total Time: 0 hours and 25 minutes. (Smith, E)
June 25, 2020 Filing 19 ORAL Motion to extend the answer deadline until after the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction by AJ's Apizza, LLC. (Jaiman, R.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction with supporting affidavit and memorandum of law in oppossition filed by AJ's Apizza, LLC. (Pite, David)
June 17, 2020 Answer deadline updated for AJ's Apizza, LLC to 7/10/2020. (Smith, E)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 10,2020 to respond/plead to the verified complaint. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/17/2020. (Smith, E)
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 10,2020 to respond/plead to verified complaint by AJ's Apizza, LLC. (Pite, David)
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Status Conference set for 6/25/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Stefan R. Underhill. The call-in for the conference is 888.636.3807; when prompted for the access code, dial 650 8043 followed by #. (If asked whether to join the conference as the host, bypass that option by dialing #.) (Smith, E)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 6/17/2020). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/26/2020. (Smith, E)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/17/20initial to respond/ plead to complaint and motion, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction until 06/17/20 by AJ's Apizza, LLC. (Pite, David)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Pite on behalf of AJ's Apizza, LLC (Pite, David)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc.. AJ's Apizza, LLC served on 5/5/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Lahnin, Fatima)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc.. (Gunningsmith, Damian)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Damian K. Gunningsmith on behalf of Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc. (Gunningsmith, Damian)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Fazekas, J.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *AJ's Apizza, LLC * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Fatima Lahnin* *Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP - NH* *195 Church St. 18th floor, PO Box 1950* *New Haven, CT 06509-1950*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc., #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Standing Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 05/4/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 05/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/30/2020. Discovery due by 10/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/5/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 1, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Oliver, T.)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc..Responses due by 5/22/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause on Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Lahnin, Fatima)
May 1, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to AJ's Apizza, LLC. (Lahnin, Fatima) Modified on 5/4/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AJ's Apizza, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5835764.), filed by Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lahnin, Fatima) Modified on 5/4/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc. v. AJ's Apizza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJ's Apizza, LLC d/b/a Grand Apizza Deep River
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Apizza Shoreline, Inc.
Represented By: Fatima Lahnin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?