Audet v. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene P. Audet, Jr.
Defendant: Hartford Auto Group, Inc. and Truist Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv00606
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Truist Bank waiver sent on 5/11/2020, answer due 7/10/2020 filed by Eugene P. Audet, Jr. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 28, 2020 Answer deadline updated to 6/30/2020 per Dkt. 12. (Shafer, J.)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Hartford Auto Group, Inc's time to respond to the complaint is extended to 6/30/2020 in the absence of objection. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/28/2020. (Dannenmaier, Katherine)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time until June 30, 2020 File Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hartford Auto Group, Inc.. (Armon, Regina)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina P Armon on behalf of Hartford Auto Group, Inc. (Armon, Regina)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eugene P. Audet, Jr. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. served on 5/12/2020, answer due 6/2/2020. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Truist Bank* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Velez, F.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Auto Group, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Daniel S. Blinn* *Consumer Law Group* *35 Cold Spring Rd., Suite 512* *Rocky Hill, CT 06067*. (Velez, F.)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Eugene P. Audet, Jr. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2020. (Velez, F.)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/4/2020. (Velez, F.)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/4/2020. (Velez, F.)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/4/2020. (Velez, F.)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2020; Discovery due by 11/3/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2020. (Velez, F.)
May 4, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.)
May 4, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Truist Bank. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 4, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Auto Group, Inc.. (Blinn, Daniel)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Auto Group, Inc., Truist Bank ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5838120.), filed by Eugene P. Audet, Jr.(Blinn, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Audet v. Hartford Auto Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truist Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene P. Audet, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Blinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?