Gottlieb et al v. Lamont et al
Plaintiff: Lorna Chand and Andy Gottlieb
Defendant: Denise Merrill and Ned Lamont
Case Number: 3:2020cv00623
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RULING denying #35 MOTION for Reconsideration re #33 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment by Jason W. Bartlett. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/2/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 24, 2020 Filing 41 Memorandum in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Reconsideration re #33 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by Democratic State Central Committee. (Reynolds, Kevin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 40 Memorandum in Opposition re #35 MOTION for Reconsideration re #33 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura)
June 24, 2020 Filing 39 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To File Answer and to Respond to Motion for Class Certification as to #14 MOTION to Certify Class as to First Claim until 08/28/20 by Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: All of the parties in this case are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by July 7, 2020 as to whether the court should grant #37 MOTION to Intervene in support of plaintiffs by Robert Halstead. Show Cause Response due by 7/7/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/23/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
June 22, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Intervene in support of plaintiffs by Robert Halstead.Responses due by 7/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Intervening Complaint, #2 Declaration of Robert Halstead with Redacted Exhibits)(Taubes, Alexander)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The defendants are hereby ordered to respond to plaintiff's #35 MOTION for Reconsideration on or before June 25, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/19/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Reconsideration re #33 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment by Jason W. Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Jason Bartlett and Exhibit)(Taubes, Alexander)
June 8, 2020 Filing 33 RULING: For the reasons stated herein, plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #9 )is denied. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/8/2020. (Lewis, D)
June 5, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2020; granting #26 Motion to Intervene; #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Declaratory Judgment is taken under advisement, ruling to issue; Clerk is directed to seal attachment #5 to Doc. No. #31 . Redacted version to be filed. Total Time: 2 hours and 45 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
June 5, 2020 Filing 32 EXHIBIT #5 Redacted by Court Order by Jason W. Bartlett, Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, Richard Lacourciere re #31 Reply to Response to Motion,,. (Taubes, Alexander)
June 2, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Jason W. Bartlett, Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, Richard Lacourciere. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supp. Dec. & Expert Report of Andy Gottlieb, #2 Exhibit Supp. Dec. & Expert Report of Jason Bartlett, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Sergio Rodriguez, #4 Exhibit May 28 Affidavit of Tawana Galberth, #5 Exhibit May 28 Affidavit of Renee Brown & Petitions, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Antonia Oglesby)(Taubes, Alexander)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE regarding hearing via Zoom: The Motion Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2020 at 10:00 a.m. will be conducted via Zoom. The video link is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1605444945 and call in number is 1-646-828-7666.Meeting ID: 1605444945 Meeting Password: 608794Please note: Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (Lewis, D)
June 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION., Motion Hearing re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Declaratory Judgment set for 6/5/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Janet C. Hall via Zoom. The public may access the proceedings by telephone at 1-646-828-7666, entering meeting ID no. 1605444945, then enter meeting password 608794 when prompted. The public may also join by video conference through the Zoom application at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1605444945, password 608794. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, screenshots, streaming, and rebroadcasting in any form, of court proceedings. The Judicial Conference of the United States, which governs the practices of the federal courts, has prohibited it. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary and appropriate by the court. (Lewis, D)
June 2, 2020 Filing 29 Memorandum in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Democratic State Central Committee. (Reynolds, Kevin)
June 2, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary or Permanent Injunction re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura)
June 1, 2020 Filing 27 Answer deadline updated for Ned Lamont to 7/9/2020; Denise Merrill to 7/9/2020., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Certify Class as to First Claim.(Responses due by 7/9/2020, ) (Lewis, D)
June 1, 2020 Filing 26 First MOTION to Intervene by Democratic State Central Committee.Responses due by 6/22/2020 (Reynolds, Kevin)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 9, 2020 To file their answer and to respond to the motion for class certification, ECF No. 14 #14 MOTION to Certify Class as to First Claim. Granted absent objection. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/1/2020. (Lewis, D) Modified on 6/1/2020 (Lewis, D).
May 27, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 9, 2020 To file their answer and to respond to the motion for class certification, ECF No. 14 #14 MOTION to Certify Class as to First Claim by Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill. (Murphy-Osborne, Maura)
May 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Oral argument re: #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 6/5/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom One, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. This hearing will be held via video conference. Technical details for connecting to the conference will docket separately. (DeRubeis, B.)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Amended Briefing Schedule re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: At the telephonic conference today 5/22/2020, given that the plaintiff indicated he could file a reply in 24 hours, and given that the court plans to schedule oral argument on plaintiff's Motion on June 5, the court amends its briefing schedule. The defendant's opposition is due by noon on June 2, and plaintiff's reply is due by noon on June 3. Absent a reply, plaintiff will have an opportunity to raise such issues at oral argument on June 5. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/22/2020.(DeRubeis, B.)
May 22, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/22/2020. The Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 9) is due on June 2, 2020, and the Plaintiff's Reply, if any, is due by noon on June 5, 2020. Total time: 40 minutes. (Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (DeRubeis, B.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill Notice of Executive Order No. 7QQ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Murphy-Osborne, Maura)
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 Document #18 Corrected: SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lorna Chand, Jason W. Bartlett, Andy Gottlieb, Richard Lacourciere. Ned Lamont served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020; Denise Merrill served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons by State Marshal Holly A. Bryk, served on Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill on 5/19/2020, filed by Jason W. Bartlett, Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, Richard Lacourciere. (Taubes, Alexander)
May 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/22/2020 03:00 PM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 1-877-873-8017; Access Code: 6415663#. (DeRubeis, B.)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Status Conference. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/19/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
May 18, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Status Conference re #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #14 MOTION to Certify Class as to First Claim - NOTICE by Jason W. Bartlett, Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, Richard Lacourciere Letter to the Court (Taubes, Alexander) Modified on 5/19/2020 to change event to a motion and edit docket text (Reis, Julia).
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Certify Class as to First Claim by Jason W. Bartlett, Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, Richard Lacourciere.Responses due by 6/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Taubes, Alexander)
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney * Alexander T. Taubes* *470 James Street, Suite 007* *New Haven, CT 06513*. (Reis, Julia)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Skold on behalf of Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill (Skold, Michael)
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alma Rose Nunley on behalf of Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill (Nunley, Alma)
May 12, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Taubes, Alexander)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura Murphy-Osborne on behalf of Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill (Murphy-Osborne, Maura)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (), MOTION for Declaratory Judgment () by Jason W. Bartlett, Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, Richard Lacourciere.Responses due by 6/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Exhibit A - Gottlieb, #3 Affidavit Exhibit B - Bartlett, #4 Affidavit Exhibit C - Lacourciere)(Taubes, Alexander)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Class Action Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants, filed by Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, Richard Lacourciere, Jason W. Bartlett.(Taubes, Alexander)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, #2 Notice of Related Case filed by Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2020. Discovery due by 11/5/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/10/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2020. (Reis, Julia)
May 6, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case by All Plaintiffs (Taubes, Alexander)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Class Action Declaratory & Injunctive Relief against Ned Lamont, Denise Merrill ( Filing fee $400 receipt number CCTDC-5841845.), filed by Lorna Chand, Andy Gottlieb.(Taubes, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gottlieb et al v. Lamont et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Chand
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Gottlieb
Represented By: Alexander T. Taubes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Merrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ned Lamont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?