Nelson v. AER Lingus, Ltd
Plaintiff: Felicia Nelson
Defendant: AER Lingus, Ltd
Case Number: 3:2020cv00629
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Amend COMPLAINT against AER Lingus, Ltd, filed by Felicia Nelson.(Clark, Karen) Modified on 6/30/2020 to correct event (Freberg, B).
June 19, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 2/20/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2021; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 3/20/2021: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/6/2020 at 3:30 PM before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. (Gutierrez, Y.)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #10 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by February 20, 2021, and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by March 20, 2021, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by April 20, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by March 20, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on November 6, 2020 at 3:30 PM. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/19/2020. (Mahler-Haug, A)
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Clark, Karen)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy L. O'Keefe on behalf of Felicia Nelson (O'Keefe, Timothy)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen K. Clark on behalf of Felicia Nelson (Clark, Karen)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Marino on behalf of AER Lingus, Ltd (Marino, Vincent)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to AER Lingus, Ltd waiver sent on 5/7/2020, answer due 7/6/2020 filed by Felicia Nelson. (Clark, Karen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Felicia Nelson, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/7/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/7/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2020; Discovery due by 11/6/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 7, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AER Lingus Limited ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5844766.), filed by Felicia Nelson.(Clark, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. AER Lingus, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AER Lingus, Ltd
Represented By: Vincent M. Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Nelson
Represented By: Karen K. Clark
Represented By: Timothy L. O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?