Bursmith et al v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Judith Bursmith and William Bursmith
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC, Air & Liquid Systems, Inc., General Electric Company, CBS Corp and Crane Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00636
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #13 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All fact discovery shall be completed by February 26, 2021, and all expert discovery shall be complete by June 30, 2021. All other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by June 30, 2021, and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by July 30, 2021. The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by June 30, 2021, or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. A telephonic status conference will be held on January 8, 2021 at 4:00pm. Plaintiff shall initiate call. Once all parties are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 773-2105. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/15/2020. (Webley, A)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by General Electric Company.(Mohan, Catherine)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Meisenkothen, Christopher)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 Crane Co. ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by Crane Co..(Lyons, Thomas)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Notice (Other) filed by General Electric Company, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by General Electric Company, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by General Electric Company, #9 Electronic Filing Order, #10 Protective Order, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by General Electric Company, #8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Notice (Other) filed by General Electric Company, #7 Notice of Appearance filed by Crane Co. Signed by Clerk on 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Freberg, B)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas N. Lyons on behalf of Crane Co. (Lyons, Thomas)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/8/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/8/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2020; Discovery due by 11/7/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/12/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/8/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 8, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/22/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by General Electric Company Notice Pursuant to Standing Order (Mohan, Catherine)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Anne Sheldon on behalf of General Electric Company (Sheldon, Tara)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine A. Mohan on behalf of General Electric Company (Mohan, Catherine)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by General Electric Company Notice of Pending Motions (Mohan, Catherine)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Mohan, Catherine)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by General Electric Company from Superior Court Judicial District of Fairfield at Bridgeport, case number ASB-FBT-CV-20-6096223-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5846861, filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal)(Mohan, Catherine)
May 8, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bursmith et al v. Air & Liquid Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Tara Anne Sheldon
Represented By: Catherine A. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corp
Represented By: Robert F. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Thomas N. Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Bursmith
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bursmith
Represented By: Christopher Meisenkothen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?