Securities and Exchange Commission v. Swanson
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Ronald D. Swanson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00666
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Ronald D. Swanson to 8/20/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/7/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Janna Douville Eastwood on behalf of Ronald D. Swanson (Eastwood, Janna)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until August 20, 2020 to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) by Ronald D. Swanson. (Spears, Brian)
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Spears on behalf of Ronald D. Swanson (Spears, Brian)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The self-represented defendant is advised that Attorney Fuller is not authorized to utilize the electronic filing system on his behalf in this matter, as to do so would violate Local Rule 5 and the Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures incorporated therein. The defendant may seek e-filing privileges for himself by filing a request for same. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/9/2020.(Gould, K.)
June 8, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Ronald D. Swanson to 7/8/2020. (Gould, K.)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before July 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 6/8/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Jonathan Jones on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Jones, Marc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 8, 2020 to Answer or Plead by Ronald D. Swanson. (Fuller, Steven)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven N. Fuller on behalf of Ronald D. Swanson Pro Se Notice of Appearance (Fuller, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Ronald D. Swanson served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Kelly, Rua)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ronald D. Swanson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Rua M. Kelly* *Securities & Exchange Commission - MA* *33 Arch St., 23rd Fl* *Boston, MA 02110-1424*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 05/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 05/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2020. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Oliver, T.)
May 14, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ronald D. Swanson. (Kelly, Rua) Modified on 5/14/2020 (Hushin, Z.).
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronald D. Swanson, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Rua) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Rua M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?