BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. T&M Brown Enterprises LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: T&M Brown Enterprises LLC and Timothy Brown
Case Number: 3:2020cv00673
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Default Entry 55(a) as to T&M Brown Enterprises LLC and Timothy Brown by BMO Harris Bank N.A. Motion for default judgment due by 7/16/2020. A Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) shall be filed or this action will be dismissed by the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 41(a). Signed by Clerk on 6/16/2020. (Perez, J.)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Entry 55(a) as to T&M Brown Enterprises LLC and Timothy Brown by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Goldstein, Evan)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Timothy Brown served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020; T&M Brown Enterprises LLC served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Goldstein, Evan)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Timothy Brown, T&M Brown Enterprises LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Evan S. Goldstein* *Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, PC-Htfd* *100 Pearl St., 17th Floor, P.O. Box 231277* *Hartford, CT 06123-1277*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Timothy Brown, T&M Brown Enterprises LLC. (Goldstein, Evan)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2020. Discovery due by 11/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 14, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BMO Harris Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal, Toronto, Canada for BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Goldstein, Evan)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5858202.), filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Goldstein, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. T&M Brown Enterprises LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&M Brown Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Evan S. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?