Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: FT SOF V Holdings, LLC and Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson, Deborah Griffin, Eyal Desheh, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Erez Vigodman
Case Number: 3:2020cv00683
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Watson on behalf of FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP (Watson, Thomas)
June 22, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Serena P. Hallowell on behalf of FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP (Hallowell, Serena)
June 22, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J. Belfi on behalf of FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP (Belfi, Eric)
June 22, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Schwartz on behalf of FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP David J. Schwartz (Schwartz, David)
June 18, 2020 Cases associated. Create association to 3:17-cv-00558-SRU. (Oliver, T.)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing the Clerk to consolidate this case into Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, et al. v. Teva Pharm. Indus., Ltd., et al., No. 3:17-cv-558 (SRU). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/18/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
June 17, 2020 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas W. Watson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5920517) by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Slossberg, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #16 MOTION for Attorney(s) David J. Schwartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5920515) by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Slossberg, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric J. Belfi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5920513) by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Slossberg, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Serena P. Hallowell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5920511) by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Slossberg, David)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Attorney Thomas W. Watson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2020. (Oliver, T.)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Attorney David J. Schwartz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2020. (Oliver, T.)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Attorney Eric J. Belfi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2020. (Oliver, T.)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Attorney Serena P. Hallowell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/16/2020. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2020. (Oliver, T.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas W. Watson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5920517) by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas W. Watson)(Slossberg, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) David J. Schwartz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5920515) by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Schwartz)(Slossberg, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Eric J. Belfi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5920513) by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric J. Belfi)(Slossberg, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Serena P. Hallowell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5920511) by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Serena P. Hallowell)(Slossberg, David)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 5/20/2020.(Jaiman, R.)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Stefan R. Underhill for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/19/2020.(Perez, J.)
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP (Slossberg, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement Updated by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Slossberg, David)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 UPDATED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP, FT SOF V Holdings, LLC.(Slossberg, David) Modified on 5/18/2020 (Blough, B.).
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David A. Slossberg* *Hurwitz Sagarin Slossberg & Knuff LLC* *147 North Broad St.* *Milford, CT 06460-0112*. (Fazekas, J.)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP, FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, #1 Complaint filed by Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP, FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, #3 Notice of Related Case filed by Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP, FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 05/18/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 05/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2020. Discovery due by 11/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
May 15, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 15, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Slossberg, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by All Plaintiffs (Slossberg, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FT SOF V Holdings, LLC, Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP. (Slossberg, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5861183.), filed by Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP, FT SOF V Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Slossberg, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP et al v. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FT SOF V Holdings, LLC
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fir Tree Value Master Fund, LP
Represented By: David A. Slossberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sigurdur Olafsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eyal Desheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erez Vigodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?