Byrd v. Wal-Mart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Florinda Byrd
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc and Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Case Number: 3:2020cv00684
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/31/2020; dispositive motions due by 1/29/2021; joint trial memorandum due by 2/26/2021; trial ready date 3/31/2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 06/15/20. (Codeanne, K.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blumberg, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc.(Blumberg, Michael)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Florinda Byrd of Demand for Trial by Jury (Licari, Christopher)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Licari on behalf of Florinda Byrd (Licari, Christopher)
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Blumberg on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc (Blumberg, Michael)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice (Other), #3 Notice (Other), #4 Notice (Other) (Springer, George)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc, and #4 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/15/2020.(Bozek, M.)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/14/2020. Discovery due by 11/14/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/19/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/15/2020.(Bozek, M.)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc identifying Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership. (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc of Pending Motions (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart, Inc Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership (Springer, George)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Inc. from Waterbury, case number UWY-CV20-6054797-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5861209, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership, Wal-Mart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Springer, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrd v. Wal-Mart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Limited Partnership
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Represented By: Michael D. Blumberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florinda Byrd
Represented By: Christopher M. Licari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?